EP3008080 - THERAPEUTICS FOR THE INDUCTION OF ENDOGENOUS STEROIDOGENESIS AND METHODS ASSOCIATED WITH THEIR IDENTIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Royal Institution for the Advancement of Learning / McGill University 845 Sherbrooke Street West 2nd Floor Montreal, Quebec H3A 0G4 / CA | [2016/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAPADOPOULOS, Vassilios 573 Grosvenor Avenue Westmount, Québec H3Y 2S6 / CA | 02 /
AGHAZADEH, Yasaman 5 Dalton Road, Apt. 2 Toronto, ON M5R 2Y8 / CA | 03 /
FAN, Jinjiang 5610 Wentworth Avenue Côte Saint-Luc, Québec H4W 2R9 / CA | [2016/36] |
Former [2016/16] | 01 /
PAPADOPOULOS, Vassilios 573 Grosvenor Avenue Westmount, Québec H3Y 2S6 / CA | ||
02 /
AGHAZADEH, Yasaman Apt. 6 3540 Jeanne Mance Montréal, Québec H2X 2K2 / CA | |||
03 /
FAN, Jinjiang 5610 Wentworth Avenue Côte Saint-Luc, Québec H4W 2R9 / CA | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/18] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2016/16] | Tischner, Oliver Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14810382.3 | 21.05.2014 | [2016/16] | WO2014CA50467 | Priority number, date | US201361834993P | 14.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361834993 P | US201461953336P | 14.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461953336 P | [2016/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014197979 | Date: | 18.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3008080 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3008080 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 18.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, A61K31/713, A61K38/17, A61P5/26, C07K19/00, C07K7/06, C07K7/08, C12N5/071, C12Q1/02, C12P33/00 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
A61K31/713 (EP,US);
C07K7/08 (US);
A61P5/26 (EP);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
C07K7/06 (US);
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
C12P33/00 (EP,US);
G01N33/5023 (US);
G01N33/5044 (EP,US);
G01N33/743 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERAPEUTIKA ZUR INDUKTION VON ENDOGENER STEROIDGENESE UND VERFAHREN IN ZUSAMMENHANG MIT IHRER IDENTIFIKATION | [2016/16] | English: | THERAPEUTICS FOR THE INDUCTION OF ENDOGENOUS STEROIDOGENESIS AND METHODS ASSOCIATED WITH THEIR IDENTIFICATION | [2016/16] | French: | AGENTS THÉRAPEUTIQUES DESTINÉS À INDUIRE UNE STÉROÏDOGENÈSE ENDOGÈNE ET MÉTHODES ASSOCIÉES À LEUR IDENTIFICATION | [2016/16] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/16] | 28.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.05.2014 | AL | 01.05.2019 | AT | 01.05.2019 | CY | 01.05.2019 | CZ | 01.05.2019 | DK | 01.05.2019 | EE | 01.05.2019 | ES | 01.05.2019 | FI | 01.05.2019 | HR | 01.05.2019 | IT | 01.05.2019 | LT | 01.05.2019 | LV | 01.05.2019 | MC | 01.05.2019 | MK | 01.05.2019 | MT | 01.05.2019 | NL | 01.05.2019 | PL | 01.05.2019 | RO | 01.05.2019 | RS | 01.05.2019 | SE | 01.05.2019 | SI | 01.05.2019 | SK | 01.05.2019 | SM | 01.05.2019 | TR | 01.05.2019 | IE | 21.05.2019 | LU | 21.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | BG | 01.08.2019 | NO | 01.08.2019 | GR | 02.08.2019 | IS | 01.09.2019 | PT | 01.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 21.05.2014 | |
AL | 01.05.2019 | ||
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
MT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 21.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 21.05.2014 | |
AL | 01.05.2019 | ||
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 21.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 21.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 21.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 21.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2006095347 (UNIV BEN GURION [IL], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9 * abstract * * page 7, line 14 - line 25 * * examples 8, 10 * * sequences 4, 14 * [I] 5; | [XP]WO2013143026 (ABMART SHANGHAI CO LTD [CN], et al) [XP] 1-3,9 * example 2 * * sequence 1158 *; | [X] - TZU-AN LIU ET AL, "14-3-3[epsilon] Overexpression Contributes to Epithelial-Mesenchymal Transition of Hepatocellular Carcinoma", PLOS ONE, (20130306), vol. 8, no. 3, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0057968, page e57968, XP055306238 [X] 10-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0057968 | International search | [X]WO2007043049 (UNIV BEN GURION [IL], et al) | by applicant | US7803351 | - AITKEN, A., "14-3-3 proteins: a historic overview", Semin. Cancer Biol., (20060000), vol. 16, doi:doi:10.1016/j.semcancer.2006.03.005, pages 162 - 172, XP024908061 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.semcancer.2006.03.005 | - FREDRIKSSON, S. et al., "Protein detection using proximity-dependent DNA ligation assays", Nat. Biotechnol., (20020000), vol. 20, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt0502-473, pages 473 - 477, XP002960538 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0502-473 | - GEGENBAUER, K.; ELIA, G.; BLANCO-FERNANDEZ, A.; SMOLENSKI, A., "Regulator of G-protein signaling 18 integrates activating and inhibitory signaling in platelets", Blood, (20120000), vol. 119, pages 3799 - 3807 | - GWYNNE, J.T.; STRAUSS, J.F., "III The role of lipoproteins in steroidogenesis and cholesterol metabolism in steroidogenic glands", Endocr. Rev., (19820000), vol. 3, pages 299 - 329 | - HORVATH, J.E.; TOLLER, G.L.; SCHALLY, A.V.; BAJO, A.M.; GROOT, K., "Effect of long-term treatment with low doses of the LHRH antagonist Cetrorelix on pituitary receptors for LHRH and gonadal axis in male and female rats", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U. S. A, (20040000), vol. 101, pages 4996 - 5001 | - KRAMER, B.; RAREY, M.; LENGAUER, T., "CASP2 experiences with docking flexible ligands using FlexX", Proteins, (19970000), pages 221 - 225 | - NAGAHARA, H. et al., "Transduction of full-length TAT fusion proteins into mammalian cells: TAT-p27Kip1 induces cell migration", Nat. Med., (19980000), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1038/4042, pages 1449 - 1452, XP002927987 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/4042 | - PERHEENTUPA, A.; HUHTANIEMI, I., "Aging of the human ovary and testis", Mol. Cell Endocrinol., (20090000), vol. 299, doi:doi:10.1016/j.mce.2008.11.004, pages 2 - 13, XP025885172 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mce.2008.11.004 | - RITCHIE, D.W.; VENKATRAMAN, V., "Ultra-fast FFT protein docking on graphics processors", Bioinformatics, (20100000), vol. 26, pages 2398 - 2405 | - TROTT, O.; OLSON, A.J., "AutoDock Vina: improving the speed and accuracy of docking with a new scoring function, efficient optimization, and multithreading", J. Comput. Chem., (20100000), vol. 31, pages 455 - 461 | - YAFFE, M.B. et al., "The structural basis for 14-3-3:phosphopeptide binding specificity", Cell, (19970000), vol. 91, doi:doi:10.1016/S0092-8674(00)80487-0, pages 961 - 971, XP002090547 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(00)80487-0 |