EP3009426 - 4-ALKYNYL IMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVE AND MEDICINE COMPRISING SAME AS ACTIVE INGREDIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaken Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 28-8, Honkomagome 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8650 / JP | [2016/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEGAMI, Satoru c/o Kaken Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. Central Research Laboratories 14 Shinomiyaminamigawara-cho Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 607-8042 / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Atsushi c/o Kaken Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. Central Research Laboratories 14 Shinomiyaminamigawara-cho Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 607-8042 / JP | 03 /
HIRANO, Kimio c/o Kaken Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. Central Research Laboratories 14 Shinomiyaminamigawara-cho Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 607-8042 / JP | 04 /
OHYAMA, Tadashi c/o Kaken Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. Central Research Laboratories 14 Shinomiyaminamigawara-cho Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 607-8042 / JP | [2016/16] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/16] | Application number, filing date | 14811154.5 | 12.06.2014 | [2016/16] | WO2014JP65643 | Priority number, date | JP20130123968 | 12.06.2013 Original published format: JP 2013123968 | [2016/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014200075 | Date: | 18.12.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3009426 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3009426 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07D233/90, A61K31/4164, A61K31/4174, A61K31/4178, A61K31/4245, A61K31/4439, A61P19/00, A61P19/02, A61P21/00, A61P25/04, A61P29/00, A61P43/00, C07D401/06, C07D401/12, C07D403/12, C07D413/12 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
A61K31/4439 (EP,RU,US);
C07D233/90 (EP,RU,US);
A61K31/4164 (EP,RU,US);
A61K31/4174 (EP,RU,US);
A61K31/4178 (EP,RU,US);
A61K31/4245 (EP,RU,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D401/06 (EP,RU,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,RU,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 4-ALKYNYL-IMIDAZOL-DERIVAT UND ARZNEIMITTEL DAMIT ALS WIRKSTOFF | [2016/16] | English: | 4-ALKYNYL IMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVE AND MEDICINE COMPRISING SAME AS ACTIVE INGREDIENT | [2016/16] | French: | DÉRIVÉ DE 4-ALCYNYLIMIDAZOLE ET MÉDICAMENT LE COMPRENANT EN TANT QUE PRINCIPE ACTIF | [2016/16] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2015 | Translation filed | 29.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/16] | 12.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.05.2018 | CY | 02.05.2018 | SM | 02.05.2018 | MT | 12.06.2018 | IS | 02.09.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
MT | 12.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
MT | 12.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | SM | 02.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO02060898 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) | International search | [A]JP2010519260 ; | [A]WO2012039972 (EISAI R&D MAN CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2012103071 (EISAI R&D MAN CO LTD [JP], et al); | by applicant | WO03099857 | WO2005021508 | WO2005105732 | WO2005105733 | WO2007121578 | WO2007143825 | WO2008017164 | WO2008104055 | WO2009005076 | WO2009139373 | WO2012039972 | WO2012103071 |