EP3008167 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING METABOLIC DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VeroScience LLC 1334 Main Road Tiverton RI 02878 / US | [2016/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CINCOTTA, Anthony, H. 1334 Main Road Tiverton Rhode Island 02878 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Yahong 31 Tupelo Road Westport Massachusetts 02790 / US | [2016/19] |
Former [2016/16] | 01 /
CINCOTTA, Anthony, H. 1334 Main Road Tiverton Rhode Island 02878 / US | ||
02 /
ZHANG, Yahong Westport Massachusetts 02790 / US | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2016/16] | Application number, filing date | 14811295.6 | 13.06.2014 | [2016/16] | WO2014US42397 | Priority number, date | US201361834864P | 13.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361834864 P | [2016/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014201411 | Date: | 18.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3008167 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/00, A61K45/06, A61K31/42, A61K31/498, A61P3/10, A61P9/10, A61P5/50 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
A61K31/498 (EP,US);
A61K31/198 (US);
A61K31/42 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (US);
A61P3/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/16] | C12N5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] | Extension states | BA | 04.01.2016 | ME | 04.01.2016 | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON STOFFWECHSELSTÖRUNGEN | [2016/16] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING METABOLIC DISORDERS | [2016/16] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES TROUBLES MÉTABOLIQUES | [2016/16] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/16] | 02.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/24] | 16.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/24] | Divisional application(s) | EP17206128.5 / EP3311842 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02089848 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [X] 1-12,16-18 * abstract *; | [X]WO2008148836 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-12,16-18 * page 1, line 1 - line 5 * * page 11, line 30 - page 12, line 29 *; | [X]WO2009053448 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-12,16-18 * page 1, line 1 - line 6 * * page 24, line 1 - line 41 *; | [X]WO2009053449 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-12,16-18 * page 1, line 1 - line 6 ** page 14, line 40 - page 15, line 37 *; | [X]WO2010057865 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-12,16-18 * page 1, line 1 - line 6 * * page 9, line 34 - page 10, line 32 *; | [X]WO2010066658 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-12,16-18 * page 1, line 1 - line 6 * * page 10, line 24 - page 11, line 23 *; | [X]US2011021584 (BERGGREN PER-OLOF [US], et al) [X] 1-12,16-18 * paragraphs [0009] - [0013] *; | [X]WO2012020848 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP], et al) [X] 1-12,16-18 * paragraphs [0001] , [0256] * | International search | [Y]US2005245612 (BLASS JOHN P [US]); | [Y]US2007129312 (YATVIN MILTON B [US], et al); | [Y]US2008200453 (CINCOTTA ANTHONY H [US]); | [Y]US2009305225 (GALBRAITH RICHARD A [US]); | [Y]WO2010015037 (HOWARD FLOREY INST [AU], et al); | [X]US2012148499 (TSIEN ROGER Y [US], et al); | [Y]US2012283193 (SPITZER NICHOLAS C [US], et al); | [X] - LAM CK ET AL., "Activation of N-methyl-D-aspartate (NMDA) receptors in the dorsal vagal complex lowers glucose production", J BIOL CHEM., (20100716), vol. 285, no. 29, pages 21913 - 21, XP055302315 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M109.087338 | [Y] - CARRANZA ET AL., "I-Dopa uptake and dopamine production in proximal tubular cells are regulated by ?2-adrenergic receptors.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY-RENAL PHYSIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 279, no. 1, pages F77 - F83, XP055302316 |