EP3077924 - DEVICE, SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR THE EFFICIENT AND LOW-DELAY SYNCHRONIZATION OF DATA STRUCTURES IN THE FORM OF GRAPHS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | [2016/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GATZSCHE, Gabriel Kirchberg 6 98693 Martinroda / DE | 02 /
GEHLHAAR, Tobias Michaelisstraße 46 99084 Erfurt / DE | 03 /
SPORER, Thomas Kieler Straße 7A 90766 Fürth / DE | 04 /
HELLER, Maximilian Ilmenauer Allee 56 98693 Ilmenau / DE | 05 /
SEIDENECK, Mario Klappenweg 15 37339 Teistungen / DE | [2016/41] | Representative(s) | Schenk, Markus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2016/41] | Application number, filing date | 14811795.5 | 02.12.2014 | [2016/41] | WO2014EP76273 | Priority number, date | DE201310225058 | 05.12.2013 Original published format: DE102013225058 | [2016/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015082479 | Date: | 11.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3077924 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2016/41] | CPC: |
G06F16/27 (EP,US);
G06F16/8373 (EP,US);
G06F16/9024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR EFFIZIENTEN UND VERZÖGERUNGSARMEN SYNCHRONISATION GRAPHENFÖRMIGER DATENSTRUKTUREN | [2016/41] | English: | DEVICE, SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR THE EFFICIENT AND LOW-DELAY SYNCHRONIZATION OF DATA STRUCTURES IN THE FORM OF GRAPHS | [2016/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE SYNCHRONISATION EFFICIENTE ET PEU RETARDÉE DE STRUCTURES DE DONNÉES DE FORME GRAPHIQUE | [2016/41] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/41] | 25.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/48] | 22.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]EP2200222 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1-27* paragraphs [0006] , [0020] , [0073] , [0108] , [0122]; figures 1,2,8,9 *; | [XI] - KATJA HOSE ET AL, Cooperative Data Management for XML Data, DATABASE AND EXPERT SYSTEMS APPLICATIONS; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 308 - 318, (20070903), ISBN 978-3-540-74467-2, XP019098708 [X] 1-7,14-16,21,24-27 * page 308, paragraph 1 - page 309, paragraph l * * page 310, paragraph 1 - page 313, paragraph 3 * * page 315, paragraph 5 - page 317, paragraph 1; figures 1-3 * [I] 8-13,17-20,22,23 | [I] - STEFAN BÖTTCHER ET AL, "Transaction Synchronization for XML Data in Client-Server Web Applications", INTERNET CITATION, (20010101), pages 388 - 395, URL: http://doesen8.informatik.unileipzig.de/webdb/wien/021.pdf, (20090225), XP002517327 [I] 1-27 * page 4, column r, paragraph 2 - page 7, column r, paragraph 3 * | [I] - MORSHED OSMANI ET AL, "A Transaction Synchronization Protocol for XML Database in Web Architecture", INTERNET CITATION, (20060401), pages 1 - 10, URL: http://www.micsymposium.org/apache2-default/mics_2006/papers/OsmaniAndRahman.pdf, (20090302), XP002517328 [I] 1-27 * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 1 * | [I] - FRANCIS GROPENGIE PRG AER ET AL, "An extended transaction model for cooperative authoring of XML data", COMPUTER SCIENCE - RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT ; COMPUTER SCIENCE - RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT ORGAN DER FACHBEREICHE SOFTWARETECHNIK, DATENBANKEN UND INFORMATIONSSYSTEME DER GESELLSCHAFT F PRG A[1/4]R INFORMATIK E.V. (GI), SPRINGER-VERLAG, BERLIN/HEIDELB, (20090606), vol. 24, no. 1-2, doi:10.1007/S00450-009-0097-1, ISSN 1865-2042, pages 85 - 100, XP019741094 [I] 1-27 * page 87, column r, paragraph l - page 98, column r, paragraph 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00450-009-0097-1 |