EP3003417 - COMPOSITIONS FOR BLOOD VESSEL TISSUE REPAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/15] | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR BLOOD VESSEL TISSUE REPAIR AND ENGINEERING | ||
[2019/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xeltis BV Lismortel 31 5612 AR Eindhoven / NL | [2016/41] |
Former [2016/15] | For all designated states Xeltis BV Lismortel 31 5612 AR Eindhoven / NL | ||
For all designated states Serino, Francesco Apartment D 15-03 Rihan Heights P.O. Box 112412 Abu Dhabi / AE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SERINO, Francesco Apartment D 15-03 Rihan Heights P.O. box 112412 Abu Dhabi / AE | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/34] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | ||
Former [2016/15] | Campbell, Patrick John Henry J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14811959.7 | 02.06.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014IB02054 | Priority number, date | US201361829810P | 31.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361829810 P | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015008152 | Date: | 22.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3003417 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3003417 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/38, A61L27/50, A61L27/52, A61L27/58 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
A61L27/58 (EP,US);
A61L27/14 (US);
A61L27/3808 (EP,US);
A61L27/507 (EP,US);
A61L27/52 (EP,US);
A61L27/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BLUTGEFÄSSGEWEBEREPARATUR | [2019/12] | English: | COMPOSITIONS FOR BLOOD VESSEL TISSUE REPAIR | [2019/12] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POUR LA RÉPARATION DES TISSUS DE VAISSEAUX SANGUINS | [2019/12] |
Former [2016/15] | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BLUTGEFÄSSGEWEBEREPARATUR UND -MANIPULATION | ||
Former [2016/15] | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR BLOOD VESSEL TISSUE REPAIR AND ENGINEERING | ||
Former [2016/15] | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS DE RÉPARATION ET D'INGÉNIERIE DE TISSU DE VAISSEAUX SANGUINS | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 15.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.06.2014 | AL | 21.08.2019 | AT | 21.08.2019 | CY | 21.08.2019 | CZ | 21.08.2019 | DK | 21.08.2019 | EE | 21.08.2019 | FI | 21.08.2019 | HR | 21.08.2019 | LT | 21.08.2019 | LV | 21.08.2019 | MC | 21.08.2019 | MK | 21.08.2019 | MT | 21.08.2019 | PL | 21.08.2019 | RO | 21.08.2019 | RS | 21.08.2019 | SE | 21.08.2019 | SI | 21.08.2019 | SK | 21.08.2019 | SM | 21.08.2019 | TR | 21.08.2019 | BG | 21.11.2019 | NO | 21.11.2019 | GR | 22.11.2019 | IS | 21.12.2019 | PT | 23.12.2019 | LU | 02.06.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 02.06.2014 | |
AL | 21.08.2019 | ||
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CY | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
MT | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
LU | 02.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
LU | 02.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 21.08.2019 | |
NO | 21.11.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4902289 (YANNAS IOANNIS V [US]) [X] 1,4-11,13-18,21,27-41,43,44,50 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 7 * * column 5, lines 7-13 * * claim - *; | [X]WO0044808 (HUBBELL JEFFREY A [CH], et al) [X] 1,3,9-15,17-20,22-26,30-42,44-51 * page 20, lines 12-22 * * page 24, line 1 - page 25, line 26 * * page 26, lines 1-19 * * page 46, lines 12-28 * * page 52, line 1 - page 54, line 6 ** claim - *; | [X]WO2009134991 (ETHICON INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7,9-11,13-18,21 * page 6, lines 15-23 * * page 7, lines 9-29 * * page 9, line 3 - page 10, line 7 * * page 13, lines 4-30 * * page 15, lines 9-18 *; | [X]US2010125330 (BELENKAYA BRONISLAVA G [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7,9-21,27-40,44,45,50 * page 2, paragraphs 12-1 * * page 4, paragraphs 34-36 * * claim - *; | [X]WO2012028881 (UNIV NOTTINGHAM [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,9-11,13-18,21-26,30-43,46-48,50,51 * page 3, paragraphs 11-16 * * page 7, paragraphs 36-39 * * claim - * |