EP3027016 - SOLUTONS FOR INCREASING THE STABILITY AND SHELF LIFE OF AN ORGAN TISSUE PRESERVATION SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Somahlution, LLC 225 Chimney Corner Lane Jupiter, FL 33458 / US | [2016/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SURYAN, Mahendra 8066 Mariposa Grove Circle Wellington, FL 33411 / US | [2016/23] | Representative(s) | Schlich, George William, et al Schlich 9 St. Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/23] | Schlich, George, et al Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | Application number, filing date | 14812052.0 | 18.11.2014 | [2016/23] | WO2014US66054 | Priority number, date | US201361963093P | 22.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361963093 P | [2016/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015077199 | Date: | 28.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3027016 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3027016 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A01N1/02 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
A01N1/021 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A01N1/0226 (IL,KR,US);
A61K38/063 (IL)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] | Extension states | BA | 27.01.2016 | ME | 27.01.2016 | Title | German: | LÖSUNGEN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER STABILITÄT UND HALTBARKEIT EINER ORGANGEWEBEKONSERVIERUNGSLÖSUNG | [2016/23] | English: | SOLUTONS FOR INCREASING THE STABILITY AND SHELF LIFE OF AN ORGAN TISSUE PRESERVATION SOLUTION | [2016/23] | French: | SOLUTIONS POUR AUGMENTER LA STABILITÉ ET LA DURÉE DE VIE EN STOCKAGE D'UNE SOLUTION DE CONSERVATION D'ORGANE ET DE TISSU | [2016/23] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 14.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.11.2014 | AL | 12.06.2019 | CY | 12.06.2019 | EE | 12.06.2019 | FI | 12.06.2019 | HR | 12.06.2019 | LT | 12.06.2019 | LV | 12.06.2019 | MC | 12.06.2019 | MK | 12.06.2019 | MT | 12.06.2019 | PL | 12.06.2019 | RO | 12.06.2019 | RS | 12.06.2019 | SI | 12.06.2019 | SK | 12.06.2019 | SM | 12.06.2019 | BG | 12.09.2019 | GR | 13.09.2019 | IS | 12.10.2019 | PT | 14.10.2019 | LU | 18.11.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 18.11.2014 | |
AL | 12.06.2019 | ||
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
MT | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
LU | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 18.11.2014 | |
AL | 12.06.2019 | ||
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
LU | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
LU | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
LU | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
LU | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 12.06.2019 | |
LT | 12.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XPI]WO2014106091 (SOMAHLUTION LLC [US]) [XP] 8,11,24,28,29 * the whole document * [I] 1-30; | [IP]WO2014106083 (SOMAHLUTION LLC [US]) [IP] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [IP]WO2014179113 (SOMAHLUTION LLC [US]) [IP] 1-30* the whole document * | by applicant | US5257985 | US6339074 | US7981596 | - THATTE HS; BISWAS KS; NAJJAR SF ET AL., "Multi-photon microscopic evaluation of saphenous vein endothelium and its preservation with a new solution", GALA. ANN THORAC SURG, (2003), vol. 75, pages 1145 - 52 | - THATTE, CIRCULATION 2013, (2003), vol. 127, pages E6 - E245 | - HUSSAINI BE; LU XG; WOLFE JA; THATTE S, "Evaluation of endoscopic vein extraction on structural and functional viability of saphenous vein endothelium", J CARIOTHORAC SURG, (2011), vol. 6, pages 82 - 90 |