EP3083182 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING HYBRID COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/43] | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF HYBRID PARTS | ||
[2018/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states nolax AG Eichenstrasse 12 6203 Sempach Station / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | For all designated states Nolax AG Eichenstrasse 12 6203 Sempach Station / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOGLER, Christian Lindenbrunnenstrasse 8 CH-6274 Eschenbach / CH | 02 /
KOCH, David Sulgenauweg 56 CH-3007 Bern / CH | 03 /
TRABER, Bruno Sonnhaldeweg 54 CH-3110 Münsingen / CH | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [2016/43] | Application number, filing date | 14812559.4 | 17.12.2014 | [2016/43] | WO2014EP78154 | Priority number, date | EP20130198963 | 20.12.2013 Original published format: EP 13198963 | [2016/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015091606 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3083182 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3083182 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/14, B29K705/00, B29L31/30 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
B29C45/14311 (EP,KR,US);
B21D22/20 (KR);
B21D28/24 (KR);
B29C45/1418 (US);
B29C45/40 (US);
B29C45/78 (KR);
B29C65/02 (US);
B29C65/48 (US);
B29C2045/14286 (EP,KR,US);
B29K2105/06 (US);
B29K2705/00 (EP,KR,US);
B29K2715/006 (EP,KR,US);
B29L2031/3002 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HYBRIDBAUTEILEN | [2016/43] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING HYBRID COMPONENTS | [2018/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE COMPOSANTS HYBRIDES | [2016/43] |
Former [2016/43] | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF HYBRID PARTS | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 20.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.09.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 26.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.12.2014 | AL | 07.11.2018 | CY | 07.11.2018 | CZ | 07.11.2018 | DK | 07.11.2018 | EE | 07.11.2018 | ES | 07.11.2018 | FI | 07.11.2018 | HR | 07.11.2018 | IT | 07.11.2018 | LT | 07.11.2018 | LV | 07.11.2018 | MC | 07.11.2018 | MK | 07.11.2018 | MT | 07.11.2018 | NL | 07.11.2018 | PL | 07.11.2018 | RO | 07.11.2018 | RS | 07.11.2018 | SE | 07.11.2018 | SI | 07.11.2018 | SK | 07.11.2018 | SM | 07.11.2018 | TR | 07.11.2018 | IE | 17.12.2018 | LU | 17.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | BG | 07.02.2019 | NO | 07.02.2019 | GR | 08.02.2019 | IS | 07.03.2019 | PT | 07.03.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/17] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
MT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IE | 17.12.2018 | ||
LU | 17.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
MT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
IE | 17.12.2018 | ||
LU | 17.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
IE | 17.12.2018 | ||
LU | 17.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
IE | 17.12.2018 | ||
LU | 17.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
IE | 17.12.2018 | ||
LU | 17.12.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
LU | 17.12.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
LU | 17.12.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | ES | 07.11.2018 | |
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | ES | 07.11.2018 | |
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 07.11.2018 | |
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 07.11.2018 | |
NO | 07.02.2019 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2010000483 (TESA SE [DE]; HUSEMANN MARC [DE]; KOOP MATTHIAS [DE]) [I] 1-3,6-15,17,18 * abstract * * page 2, line 17 * * page 10, line 34 - page 11, line 23 * * page 12, line 1 - line 17 * * page 17, line 33 - line 34 *; | [XD]WO2005061203 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]; AICHELE WILFRIED [DE]; BALD ROLF [DE]) [XD] 1,2,6-10,12-14,17,18 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 12, paragraph 2 - page 13, paragraph 2 * * page 20, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 21, paragraph 2 * * claims 8,17 19 *; | [I]US2011089792 (CASEBOLT MATTHEW P [US] ET AL) [I] 1,4,5,17,18 * abstract * * paragraph [0052] * * figure 8 *; | [A]DE102006001340 (NEUMUELLER GERT [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] *; | [A]WO2008140143 (SAMYOUNG CONNECT CO LTD [KR]; PARK YEONBUM [KR]; PARK SOONKWAN [KR]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]US2006090842 (CHERVIN CHRISTOPHE [FR]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0047] * * claims 1, 10 *; | [A] - FEDLER M, "eine starke verbindung", PLASTVERARBEITER, HUETHIG GMBH, HEIDELBERG, DE, (20090101), ISSN 0032-1338, pages 22 - 23, XP008119146 [A] 4 * page 23, column l, paragraph 2 * | Examination | WO9311924 | WO2006082006 | US2005016659 |