Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10118514 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2018 | B2 | US2016272092 | 22.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1361375 | 20.11.2013 | US201361906432 | 20.11.2013 | WO2014IB66207 | 20.11.2014 | US201415037348 | 20.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017502865 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1361375 | 20.11.2013 | US201361906432 | 20.11.2013 | WO2014IB66207 | 20.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3071480 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2020 | B1 | EP3071480 | 28.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1361375 | 20.11.2013 | US201361906432 | 20.11.2013 | WO2014IB66207 | 20.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3013328 | 04.08.2017 | B1 | FR3013328 | 22.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1361375 | 20.11.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015075671 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1361375 | 20.11.2013 | US201361906432 | 20.11.2013 |