EP3071480 - SELF-ADJUSTING VEHICLE SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zodiac Seats France Rue Robert Maréchal Senior ZI La Limoise 36100 Issoudun / FR | [2016/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OBADIA, Jean-Marc 2645 Route du Dauphine F-38100 Maubec / FR | 02 /
STRITTER, Laurent 1 Clos du Mauldre F-78990 Elancourt / FR | [2016/39] | Representative(s) | Marconnet, Sébastien Cabinet Sébastien Marconnet 1 Quinquies rue Basse de la Terrasse (Bâtiment A) 92190 Meudon / FR | [2020/26] |
Former [2016/39] | Marconnet, Sébastien Cabinet Sébastien MARCONNET 4 Ter Route des Gardes (Bâtiment A) 92190 Meudon / FR | Application number, filing date | 14812646.9 | 20.11.2014 | [2016/39] | WO2014IB66207 | Priority number, date | FR20130061375 | 20.11.2013 Original published format: FR 1361375 | US201361906432P | 20.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361906432 P | [2016/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015075671 | Date: | 28.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3071480 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3071480 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B64D11/06 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
B60N2/914 (EP,US);
B60N2/002 (US);
B60N2/0024 (EP);
B60N2/0033 (EP);
B60N2/0244 (EP,US);
B60N2/0268 (EP,US);
B64D11/06 (EP,US);
B64D11/0647 (EP,US);
B60N2210/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2016/39] | B64D11/06, B60N2/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTEINSTELLENDER FAHRZEUGSITZ | [2016/39] | English: | SELF-ADJUSTING VEHICLE SEAT | [2016/39] | French: | SIÈGE DE VÉHICULE AUTO-RÉGLABLE | [2016/39] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/39] | 19.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2017 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 10.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 18.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.11.2014 | AL | 24.06.2020 | AT | 24.06.2020 | CY | 24.06.2020 | CZ | 24.06.2020 | DK | 24.06.2020 | EE | 24.06.2020 | ES | 24.06.2020 | FI | 24.06.2020 | HR | 24.06.2020 | IT | 24.06.2020 | LT | 24.06.2020 | LV | 24.06.2020 | MC | 24.06.2020 | MK | 24.06.2020 | MT | 24.06.2020 | NL | 24.06.2020 | PL | 24.06.2020 | RO | 24.06.2020 | RS | 24.06.2020 | SE | 24.06.2020 | SI | 24.06.2020 | SK | 24.06.2020 | SM | 24.06.2020 | TR | 24.06.2020 | BG | 24.09.2020 | NO | 24.09.2020 | GR | 25.09.2020 | IS | 24.10.2020 | PT | 26.10.2020 | IE | 20.11.2020 | LU | 20.11.2020 | BE | 30.11.2020 | CH | 30.11.2020 | LI | 30.11.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 20.11.2014 | |
AL | 24.06.2020 | ||
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CY | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
MK | 24.06.2020 | ||
MT | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
TR | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
IE | 20.11.2020 | ||
LU | 20.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 20.11.2014 | |
AL | 24.06.2020 | ||
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CY | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
MT | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
TR | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
IE | 20.11.2020 | ||
LU | 20.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
IE | 20.11.2020 | ||
LU | 20.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
LU | 20.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
LU | 20.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
LU | 20.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 24.06.2020 | |
NO | 24.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5060174 (GROSS CLIFFORD M [US]) [Y] 15,16 * abstract *; | [XYI]US5283735 (GROSS CLIFFORD M [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * figure - * * column 1, line 19 - line 22 * * column 3, line 18 - line 54 * * column 4, line 47 - line 60 * [Y] 4-7,15,16 [I] 2,8-14; | [Y]US5687099 (GROSS CLIFFORD M [US], et al) [Y] 15,16 * abstract *; | [A]WO9841126 (MCCORD WINN TEXTRON INC [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 4, line 30 - page 6, line 21 * * page 7, line 20 - page 8, line 19 * * page 16, line 27 - page 18, line 16 ** figures 1, 11 *; | [Y]EP1958816 (PRECILEC [FR]) [Y] 4-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0021] * |