EP3011057 - DETERMINATION OF INTRACELLULAR BACTERIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stender Diagnostics Fasanhaven 5 2820 Gentofte / DK | [2016/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STENDER, Henrik Fasanhaven 5 DK-2820 Gentofte / DK | [2016/17] | Representative(s) | IP-Safe ApS Banegårdspladsen 1 1570 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2016/17] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 14814049.4 | 12.06.2014 | [2016/17] | WO2014DK00032 | Priority number, date | DK20130000361 | 16.06.2013 Original published format: DK 201300361 | [2016/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014202080 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3011057 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | XN | 24.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12Q1/14, C12R1/445, G01N33/53 | [2016/17] | CPC: |
C12Q1/689 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6841 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6841, C12Q2525/107 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/17] | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG VON INTRAZELLULÄREN BAKTERIEN | [2016/17] | English: | DETERMINATION OF INTRACELLULAR BACTERIA | [2016/17] | French: | DÉTERMINATION DE BACTÉRIES INTRACELLULAIRES | [2016/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: XN | 18.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/17] | 18.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 24.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 28.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/40] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.10.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 24.10.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.12.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.08.2017 | 30.06.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1403381 (FUSO PHARMACEUTICAL IND [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract *; | [XI]US2008108064 (STENDER HENRIK [DK], et al) [X] 1-3,5,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0072] * [I] 4,6,7; | [XI]WO2010135480 (ADVANDX INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,8 * abstract * [I] 4,6; | [Y]WO2012135620 (ADVANDX INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract *; | [Y] - SANTHAMOORTHY M ET AL, "Direct Detection of Bacteria in Platelet Concentrates by PNA FISH", ABSTRACTS OF THE GENERAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20110101), vol. 111, ISSN 1060-2011, XP009193190 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * | [Y] - SOEGAARD M ET AL, "Dual color PNA FISH test for simultaneous identification of Staphylococcus aureus and coagulase-negative staphylococci directly from positive blood culture bottles", ABSTRACTS OF THE GENERAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20050101), vol. 105, ISSN 1060-2011, XP009193196 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * | [Y] - PAINTER T M ET AL, "Thirteen Months' Experience with the Rapid PNA FISH (R) Protocol for Identification of Staphylococcus aureus from Positive Blood Culture Bottles", ABSTRACTS OF THE GENERAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20100101), vol. 110, ISSN 1060-2011, XP009193193 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * | [Y] - PHENGVATH C, "Standardized Procedure for Identification of Bacteria and Yeast Directly from Positive Blood Culture within 60 Minutes by Peptide Nucleic Acid Fluorescence In-Situ Hybridization", ABSTRACTS OF THE GENERAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20100101), vol. 110, ISSN 1060-2011, XP009193184 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * | [Y] - LANCE B D ET AL, "Gram PNA FISH, a Molecular Gram Stain, for Gram Typing of Positive Blood Cultures", ABSTRACTS OF THE GENERAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20110101), vol. 111, ISSN 1060-2011, XP009193189 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [X]EP1403381 (FUSO PHARMACEUTICAL IND [JP], et al); | [X]EP1403369 (FUSO PHARMACEUTICAL IND [JP]); | [X]WO2010135480 (ADVANDX INC [US], et al); | [X]CN101974626 (UNIV SHANGHAI JIAOTONG); | [X]WO2012135620 (ADVANDX INC [US], et al); | [X] - OLIVEIRA, K. ET AL., "Rapid identification of Staphylococcus aureus directly from blood cultures by fluorescence in situ hybridization with peptide nucleic acid probes.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (2002), vol. 40, no. 1, pages 247 - 251, XP055302785 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.40.1.247-251.2002 | [Y] - CHEN, G. ET AL., "Development of a PNA probe for fluorescence in situ hybridization detection of Prorocentrum donghaiense.", PLOS ONE, (2011), vol. 6, no. 10, pages 1 - 8, XP055302786 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0025527 | [X] - HARTMANN. H. ET AL., "Rapid identification of Staphylococcus aureus in blood cultures by a combination of fluorescence in situ hybridization using peptide nucleic acid probes and flow cytometry.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (2005), vol. 43, no. 9, pages 4855 - 4857, XP055296834 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.43.9.4855-4857.2005 | [X] - SACHSE, F. ET AL., "STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS INVADES THE EPITHELIUM IN NASAL POLYPOSIS AND INDUCES IL-6 IN NASAL EPITHELIAL CELLS IN VITRO.", ALLERGY, (2010), vol. 65, no. 11, pages 1430 - 1437, XP055302789 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1398-9995.2010.02381.x | [X] - BENINATI, T. ET AL., "A novel alpha-proteobacterium resides in the mitochondria of ovarian cells of the tick Ixodes ricinus.", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (2004), vol. 70, no. 5, pages 2596 - 2602, XP055302790 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.70.5.2596-2602.2004 | [A] - AMANN, R.I., "In situ hybridization of micro-organisms by whole- cell hybridization with rRNA-targeted nucleic acid probes.", MOLECULAR MICROBIAL ECOLOGY MANUAL, (1995), pages 331 - 345, XP008183010 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-94-011-0351-0_23 |