EP3011543 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF DETERMINING LOCATION USING A MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zoll Medical Corporation 269 Mill Road Chelmsford, MA 01824 / US | [2016/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, Guy 22 Magnolia Avenue Gloucester, MA 01930 / US | [2016/17] | Representative(s) | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstraße 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/17] | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14814128.6 | 18.06.2014 | [2016/17] | WO2014US42981 | Priority number, date | US201361836979P | 19.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361836979 P | [2016/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014205098 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3011543 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G08B1/08, A61B5/00, G01C21/20, A61B5/0408, A61B5/0452, A61B5/11, G01C21/28, G01S19/14, G01S19/42 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
A61B5/4836 (EP,US);
A61B5/1112 (US);
A61B5/0006 (US);
A61B5/1118 (US);
A61B5/282 (US);
A61B5/6804 (US);
A61B5/7405 (US);
A61B5/746 (US);
A61B5/747 (US);
G01C21/20 (US);
G01C21/206 (EP,US);
G01S19/14 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/17] | G08B1/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/17] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR POSITIONSBESTIMMUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER MEDIZINISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2016/17] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF DETERMINING LOCATION USING A MEDICAL DEVICE | [2016/17] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE LOCALISATION UTILISANT UN DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL | [2016/17] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 30.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/17] | 10.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.12.2019 | 11.12.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | 19.01.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012089330 (HESCH JOEL [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10,11 * paragraphs [0012] , [0 14] , [0 17] , [0 19] , [0 21] , [0 29] , [0 33] - [0036] * * figure 1 *; | [X]US2013009783 (TRAN BAO [US]) [X] 1,2,10,11 * paragraphs [0044] , [0 46] , [0 77] , [0 80] *; | [X] - KHAJEHNOURI N ET AL, "Network-based wireless location", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20050701), vol. 22, no. 4, doi:10.1109/MSP.2005.1458275, ISSN 1053-5888, pages 24 - 40, XP011135184 [X] 1,2,10,11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MSP.2005.1458275 | International search | [A]US2005186967 (OZLUTURK FATIH [US]); | [Y]US2011009813 (RANKERS ULRICH [US]); | [A]US2011051658 (JIN ZHENGYI [US], et al); | [Y]US2012252485 (WOLVERTON ANDREW N [US], et al); | [Y]US2013045759 (SMITH CLINT [US]) |