EP3065861 - CHEMICAL REACTOR WITH MANIFOLD FOR MANAGEMENT OF A FLOW OF GASEOUS REACTION MEDIUM THERETO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Watt Fuel Cell Corp. 402 East Main Street Suite 800 Mount Pleasant, PA 15666 / US | [2016/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINNERTY, Caine, M. 402E Main Street Mount Pleasant, PA 15666 / US | 02 /
DEWALD, Paul 207 Tinstman Drive Scottdale, PA 15666 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/37] | 01 /
FINNERTY, Caine, M. 3 Henderson Place Port Washington, NY 11050 / US | ||
02 /
DEWALD, Paul 207 Tinstman Drive Scottdale, PA 15666 / US | Representative(s) | Fabry, Bernd IP2 Patentanwalts GmbH Schlossstrasse 523-525 41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2016/37] | Application number, filing date | 14815116.0 | 05.11.2014 | [2016/37] | WO2014US64116 | Priority number, date | US201361900543P | 06.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361900543 P | US201361900510P | 06.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361900510 P | [2016/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015069762 | Date: | 14.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3065861 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01J12/00, B01J19/24, C01B3/38, B01J8/06, B01J8/18, B01J19/00, B01J8/02, B01J4/00 | [2016/37] | CPC: |
C01B3/386 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J12/005 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J10/007 (CN);
B01J12/007 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J19/0013 (KR,US);
B01J19/0093 (US);
B01J19/2415 (US);
B01J19/2425 (KR);
B01J19/2445 (US);
B01J4/001 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J4/002 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J4/005 (EP,KR,US);
B01J7/00 (US);
B01J8/0285 (US);
B01J8/065 (EP,KR,US);
B01J8/067 (US);
B01J8/1836 (US);
B01J8/24 (US);
H01M8/04089 (CN);
H01M8/04186 (CN);
H01M8/04298 (CN);
H01M8/0618 (KR);
B01J2208/00389 (US);
B01J2208/00902 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00911 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00006 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00058 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2219/00063 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2219/00069 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2219/00117 (US);
B01J2219/00132 (US);
B01J2219/00135 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2219/00155 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00157 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2219/00159 (EP,US);
B01J2219/002 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00213 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00234 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00585 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0233 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/0244 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/0261 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C01B2203/0844 (US);
C01B2203/085 (KR,US);
C01B2203/1223 (EP,CN,US);
C01B2203/1229 (EP,CN,US);
C01B2203/1235 (EP,CN,US);
C01B2203/1241 (EP,CN,US);
C01B2203/1247 (EP,CN,US);
C01B2203/1276 (KR);
C01B2203/141 (US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] | Title | German: | CHEMISCHER REAKTOR MIT VERTEILER ZUR VERWALTUNG EINES ZUSTROMS EINES GASFÖRMIGEN REAKTIONSMEDIUMS | [2016/37] | English: | CHEMICAL REACTOR WITH MANIFOLD FOR MANAGEMENT OF A FLOW OF GASEOUS REACTION MEDIUM THERETO | [2016/37] | French: | RÉACTEUR CHIMIQUE DOTÉ D'UN COLLECTEUR POUR LA RÉGULATION DE L'ÉCOULEMENT D'UN FLUIDE RÉACTIONNEL GAZEUX ENTRANT | [2016/37] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/37] | 20.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3518284 (FOSTER E GORDON) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 3; figures 1, 2 *; | [X]US3560167 (BRUCKNER CHARLES J, et al) [X] 1-4,6,7 * abstract * * column 1, line 59 - line 72 * * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 53; figures 1, 2; claim - *; | [X]US5690763 (ASHMEAD JAMES WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,12 * abstract * * column 6, line 42 - line 57 * * column 9, line 8 - line 28 * * column 10, line 24 - line 55 * * column 13, line 40 - line 65; figures 2, 3, 6, 7 * * column 7, line 26 - line 30 *; | [X]EP1382382 (CONOCO PHILLIPS COMPANY [US]) [X] 1-4,6-10,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0044]; figures 3, 4; claim - *; | [X]WO2004091771 (UHDE GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0028]; figures 1, 3; claim - *; | [X]US2006133976 (MALE JONATHAN L [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0030] *; | [X]US2007289215 (HEMMINGS JOHN WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0076]; figures 3-7; claim - *; | [X]US2011189578 (CRUMM AARON T [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 4 ** paragraph [0021]; figures 3, 4 * | by applicant | US2013230787 |