EP3083786 - COMPOSITION WHICH IS SUITABLE FOR PRODUCING POLYURETHANE FOAMS AND CONTAINS AT LEAST ONE HFO BLOWING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.03.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1- 11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLOSTERMANN, Michael Brandstorstrasse 9 45239 Essen / DE | 02 /
VENZMER, Joachim Leinwebermarkt 4 45239 Essen / DE | 03 /
EILBRACHT, Christian Mont Cenisstrasse 543 44627 Herne / DE | 04 /
GLOS, Martin Realschulstrasse 9 46325 Borken / DE | 05 /
SCHILLER, Carsten Kölnerstrasse 41 40885 Ratingen / DE | [2016/43] | Application number, filing date | 14815274.7 | 05.12.2014 | [2016/43] | WO2014EP76712 | Priority number, date | DE201310226575 | 19.12.2013 Original published format: DE102013226575 | [2016/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015091021 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3083786 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/00, C08J9/14 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
C08J9/0004 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/14 (US);
C08G18/163 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/18 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/225 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/4804 (US);
C08J9/0061 (EP,KR,US);
C08J9/144 (EP,KR,US);
C08J9/146 (EP,KR,US);
F16L59/028 (US);
C08G2101/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2201/022 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2203/142 (US);
C08J2203/162 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2205/052 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, GEEIGNET ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYURETHANSCHÄUMEN, ENTHALTEND MINDESTENS EIN HFO-TREIBMITTEL | [2016/43] | English: | COMPOSITION WHICH IS SUITABLE FOR PRODUCING POLYURETHANE FOAMS AND CONTAINS AT LEAST ONE HFO BLOWING AGENT | [2016/43] | French: | COMPOSITION ADÉQUATE POUR FABRIQUER DES MOUSSES DE POLYURÉTHANE, CONTENANT AU MOINS UN AGENT POROGÈNE À BASE DE HFO | [2016/43] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 01.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/30] | 17.03.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDAI]EP2197935 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) | by applicant | DE1802500 | DE1802503 | US3578612 | DE1745443 | DE1745459 | US3933695 | DE2533074 | US4147847 | US4855379 | EP0493836 | EP0533202 | DE4229402 | DE4239054 | WO9612759 | EP0767199 | EP0780414 | EP0839852 | EP0656382 | EP0867464 | WO9842764 | EP1161474 | US6359022 | US2002103091 | US6472446 | WO2004096882 | WO2005008383 | EP1520873 | EP1537159 | EP1544235 | DE102004001408 | WO2005085310 | WO2005118668 | EP1678232 | WO2006094227 | EP1712578 | WO2006116456 | US2007072951 | WO2007094780 | WO2007111828 | US2007238800 | US2007282026 | EP1873209 | US2008234402 | EP1977825 | EP1985642 | EP1985644 | US2009305875 | EP2154223 | WO2013026813 | EP2197935 |