EP3080820 - MAGNETIC MATERIALS AND METHODS FOR THEIR MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Exmet AB Norrängsvägen 69B 141 43 Huddinge / SE | [2016/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UNOSSON, Mattias Exmet AB Norrängsvägen 69 B S-141 43 Huddinge / SE | 02 /
HJÖRVARSSON, Björgvin Box 516 Uppsala University Department of Physics and Astronomy S-751 20 Uppsala / SE | 03 /
KAPAKLIS, Vassilios Box 516 Uppsala University Department of Physics and Astronomy S-751 20 Uppsala / SE | 04 /
MAGNUS, Fridrik Box 516 Uppsala University Department of Physics and Astronomy S-751 20 Uppsala / SE | [2016/42] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/44] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2016/42] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14815632.6 | 10.12.2014 | [2016/42] | WO2014EP77278 | Priority number, date | GB20130022010 | 12.12.2013 Original published format: GB 201322010 | [2016/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015086705 | Date: | 18.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3080820 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3080820 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/153, H01F41/02, B22F3/105, // C22C38/00, C22C38/02, C22C38/12 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
H01F1/15333 (EP,US);
H01F41/0273 (GB);
B22F10/00 (GB);
B22F10/28 (EP,GB,US);
B22F12/20 (EP,GB,US);
B23K15/0026 (US);
B23K15/0086 (US);
B23K15/0093 (US);
B23K26/0006 (US);
B23K26/342 (US);
B23K26/702 (US);
B23K26/703 (US);
B33Y10/00 (US);
B33Y30/00 (US);
B33Y40/00 (EP,GB,US);
B33Y80/00 (US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/12 (EP,US);
H01F1/08 (GB);
H01F41/02 (GB);
H01F41/0226 (EP,US);
H01F7/02 (GB);
B22F10/38 (EP,GB,US);
B22F12/30 (EP,GB,US);
B22F12/46 (EP,GB,US);
B22F12/53 (EP,GB,US);
B22F2202/05 (EP,US);
C22C2200/02 (EP,US);
C22C2202/02 (EP,US);
Y02P10/25 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/42] | H01F1/153, H01F41/02, B22F3/105 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHE MATERIALIEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2016/42] | English: | MAGNETIC MATERIALS AND METHODS FOR THEIR MANUFACTURE | [2016/42] | French: | MATÉRIAUX MAGNÉTIQUES ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2016/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/42] | 16.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.09.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 24.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.12.2014 | AL | 30.10.2019 | CY | 30.10.2019 | CZ | 30.10.2019 | DK | 30.10.2019 | EE | 30.10.2019 | HR | 30.10.2019 | LT | 30.10.2019 | LV | 30.10.2019 | MC | 30.10.2019 | MK | 30.10.2019 | MT | 30.10.2019 | PL | 30.10.2019 | RO | 30.10.2019 | RS | 30.10.2019 | SI | 30.10.2019 | SK | 30.10.2019 | SM | 30.10.2019 | TR | 30.10.2019 | IE | 10.12.2019 | LU | 10.12.2019 | BG | 30.01.2020 | NO | 30.01.2020 | GR | 31.01.2020 | IS | 29.02.2020 | PT | 02.03.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 10.12.2014 | |
AL | 30.10.2019 | ||
CY | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
MT | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
TR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IE | 10.12.2019 | ||
LU | 10.12.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 10.12.2014 | |
AL | 30.10.2019 | ||
CY | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
MT | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
IE | 10.12.2019 | ||
LU | 10.12.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 10.12.2014 | |
AL | 30.10.2019 | ||
CY | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
IE | 10.12.2019 | ||
LU | 10.12.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CY | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
IE | 10.12.2019 | ||
LU | 10.12.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
IE | 10.12.2019 | ||
LU | 10.12.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
IE | 10.12.2019 | ||
LU | 10.12.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | HR | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | LT | 30.10.2019 | |
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | LT | 30.10.2019 | |
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 30.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5545367 (BAE YOUNG C [US], et al) [X] 1-16,18-23 * column 9, lines 13-40 * * column 14, lines 3-21 * * figures 1, 3 * [I] 17; | [XI]US2010003503 (SEPPALA EIRA T [FI], et al) [X] 1-16,18-23 * paragraphs [0051] , [0052] * * paragraphs [0059] - [0061] * * paragraph [0074] * * figures 2, 5 *[I] 17; | [X]JP2012019030 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-23 * paragraphs [0038] - [0039] - [0050] * * paragraphs [0053] - [0055] * * figures 1,4 *; | [XI]EP2565022 (BOEING CO [US]) [X] 1-16,18-23 * paragraphs [0040] - [0047] - [0051] * * figures 1, 4, 5, 9 * [I] 17 | Examination | WO2012073089 |