EP3092192 - DEVICE FOR PICKING UP AND TRANSPORTING A SILICON ROD, AS WELL AS METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYCRYSTALLINE SILICON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/46] | DEVICE FOR RECEIVING AND TRANSPORTING A SILICON ROD, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYCRYSTALLINE SILICON | ||
[2018/13] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker Chemie AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [2016/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGER, Günter Herzog-Albrecht-Str. 5 84375 Kirchdorf / DE | 02 /
RIESS, Siegfried Hofstadt 13 A-5121 Tarsdorf / AT | [2016/46] | Representative(s) | Potten, Holger, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [2016/46] | Application number, filing date | 14816190.4 | 11.12.2014 | [2016/46] | WO2014EP77318 | Priority number, date | DE201410200058 | 07.01.2014 Original published format: DE102014200058 | [2016/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015104126 | Date: | 16.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3092192 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B66C1/42, B66F9/18, B65G47/90, B65G47/91, C01B33/035 | [2018/13] | CPC: |
B66C1/422 (EP,KR,US);
B65G47/902 (US);
B65G47/91 (US);
B66C1/425 (EP,KR,US);
B66F9/18 (EP,KR,US);
C01B33/035 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/46] | B66C1/42, B66F9/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/46] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFNEHMEN UND TRANSPORT EINES SILICIUMSTABS SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYKRISTALLINEM SILICIUM | [2016/46] | English: | DEVICE FOR PICKING UP AND TRANSPORTING A SILICON ROD, AS WELL AS METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYCRYSTALLINE SILICON | [2018/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR SAISIR ET TRANSPORTER UN BARREAU DE SILICIUM, AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE SILICIUM POLYCRISTALLIN | [2018/13] |
Former [2016/46] | DEVICE FOR RECEIVING AND TRANSPORTING A SILICON ROD, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYCRYSTALLINE SILICON | ||
Former [2016/46] | DISPOSITIF SERVANT À LOGER ET À TRANSPORTER UN BARREAU DE SILICIUM ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE UN SILICIUM POLYCRISTALLIN | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/46] | 16.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/07] | 28.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]USRE29805E (KOEHNEN E.L.) [A] 1,7,8* figure - *; | [A]CN201264866Y (XIANGFU TAN [CN]) [A] 1,7,8 * figure - *; | [AD]CN102092660 (HOUZHONG WANG) [AD] 1,7,8 * figure - *; | [A]CN202415749U (YINGLI SOLAR CHINA CO LTD) [A] 1,7,8 * figure - *; | [A]JP2013043734 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1,7,8 * abstract * * figures 1, 2 * | by applicant | EP0338682 | CN102092660 | US2012237678 |