EP3082610 - SHAPE SENSED ROBOTIC ULTRASOUND FOR MINIMALLY INVASIVE INTERVENTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2016/43] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMACHANDRAN, Bharat c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
KAHYA, Neriman Nicoletta c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | Steffen, Thomas Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 14816412.2 | 27.11.2014 | [2016/43] | WO2014IB66378 | Priority number, date | US201361916821P | 17.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361916821 P | [2016/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015092581 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3082610 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/00 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B1/00013 (US);
A61B1/00147 (US);
A61B34/30 (EP,US);
A61B8/085 (EP,US);
A61B8/4254 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2061 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2063 (US);
A61B2034/301 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Title | German: | ROBOTISCHER ULTRASCHALL MIT ERFASSTER FORM FÜR MINIMAL INVASIVE EINGRIFFE | [2016/43] | English: | SHAPE SENSED ROBOTIC ULTRASOUND FOR MINIMALLY INVASIVE INTERVENTIONS | [2016/43] | French: | ÉCHOGRAPHIE ROBOTISÉE À DÉTECTION DE FORME POUR INTERVENTIONS MINI-INVASIVES | [2016/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 26.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2002183592 (SUZUKI NAOKI [JP], et al) [Y] 5,15 * paragraphs [0168] - [0170] - [ 218] - [0220]; figures 10, 11, 33 *; | [A]JP2004049558 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,11* paragraphs [0044] - [0047]; figure 6 *; | [Y]US2011224684 (LARKIN DAVID Q [US], et al) [Y] 5-8,15 * paragraphs [0034] , [0 36] , [0043] - [0049] - [0079] - [0104]; figure - *; | [XYI]WO2012143885 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,11 * page 8 - page 9; figures 13, 14 * [Y] 5-8,10,15 [I] 2-4,9,12-14; | [Y] - Naoshi Koizumi ET AL, "Development of Three-Dimensional Endoscopic Ultrasound System with Optical Tracking", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, Berlin, Heidelberg, Springer Berlin Heidelberg, (20020101), vol. 2488, pages 60 - 65, doi:10.1007/3-540-45786-0_8, ISSN 0302-9743, ISBN 978-3-54-045234-8, XP055177241 [Y] 5,15 * page 61 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-45786-0_8 | [Y] - CAITLIN SCHNEIDER ET AL, Intra-operative Pick-Up Ultrasound for Robot Assisted Surgery with Vessel Extraction and Registration: A Feasibility Study, INFORMATION PROCESSING IN COMPUTER-ASSISTED INTERVENTIONS, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 122 - 132, (20110622), ISBN 978-3-642-21503-2, XP047022927 [Y] 10 * sections "Introduction", "Materials and Methods" and "Discussion" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-21504-9_12 | Examination | WO2008097540 |