Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105247482B | Global Dossier | 22.10.2019 | B | CN105247482 | 13.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014KR05787 | 30.06.2014 | KR20130075239 | 28.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3014428 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2017 | A4 | EP3014428 | 04.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014KR05787 | 30.06.2014 | KR20130075239 | 28.06.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014209078 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20130075239 | 28.06.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9959107 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2018 | B2 | US2015007157 | 01.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20130075239 | 28.06.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102255952B | Global Dossier | 25.05.2021 | B1 | KR20150002542 | 07.01.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20130075239 | 28.06.2013 |