EP3014428 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR UPDATING APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2016/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Sunmin No.110-901 83 Munjeong-ro Songpa-gu Seoul 138-764 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Sangho No.201-1902 51 Gwonseon-ro 908beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-390 / KR | 03 /
MOON, Boseok No.644-1103 34 Sanboncheon-ro Gunpo-si Gyeonggi-do 435-705 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Jaehyun No.B-1005 447 Toegye-ro Jung-gu Seoul 100-871 / KR | [2016/18] | Representative(s) | Lorenz, Sönke Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2016/18] | Application number, filing date | 14816837.0 | 30.06.2014 | [2016/18] | WO2014KR05787 | Priority number, date | KR20130075239 | 28.06.2013 Original published format: KR 20130075239 | [2016/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014209078 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3014428 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, G06F3/01, G06F15/16, G06F9/445, H04M1/725 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
G06F8/65 (EP,US);
G06F9/44 (KR);
G06F15/16 (KR);
G06F3/01 (KR);
H04M1/72406 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/18] | G06F9/44, G06F3/01, G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AKTUALISIERUNG EINER ANWENDUNG | [2016/18] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR UPDATING APPLICATION | [2016/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE MISE À JOUR D'UNE APPLICATION | [2016/18] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/18] | 19.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/10] | 14.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.10.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007192763 (HELVICK RICHARD E [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0026] *; | [A]US2008052698 (OLSON KIPLEY J [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0030] *; | [Y]US2010107150 (KAMADA TOMIHISA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0099] *; | [Y] - "Android 2.3.4 User's Guide", Android 2.3.4 User's Guide, (20110320), XP055178792 [Y] 1-15 * page 352 - page 353 * | International search | [A]US2004010786 (COOL JAMIE L [US], et al); | [A]KR101083189B (LG UPLUS CORP [KR]); | [A]KR20130022488 (PANTECH CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20130066421 (KT CORP [KR]) | by applicant | US2010107150 |