EP3004320 - CLOSED SYSTEM DEVICE AND METHODS FOR GAS PERMEABLE CELL CULTURE PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilson Wolf Manufacturing, LLC 2100 Old Highway 8 NW St Paul, MN 55112 / US | [2024/06] |
Former [2016/15] | For all designated states Wilson Wolf Manufacturing Corporation 33-5th Avenue NW Suite 700 New Brighton, MN 55112 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WELCH, Daniel P. 9987 245th Avenue NW Zimmerman, MN 55330 / US | 02 /
WILSON, John R. 173 Windsor Lane New Brighton, MN 55112 / US | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Haslam, Simon David, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14818630.7 | 24.06.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014US43914 | Priority number, date | US201361838730P | 24.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361838730 P | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014210036 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3004320 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/00, C12M1/26, C12M1/34, C12M1/36 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
C12M47/02 (EP,IL,US);
C12M23/24 (EP,IL,US);
C12M29/04 (EP,IL,US);
C12M41/34 (EP,IL,US);
C12M41/44 (EP,IL,US);
C12M41/48 (EP,IL,US);
C12Q3/00 (EP,IL,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | C12M1/00, C12M1/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG MIT GESCHLOSSENEM SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR GASDURCHLÄSSIGES ZELLKULTURVERFAHREN | [2016/15] | English: | CLOSED SYSTEM DEVICE AND METHODS FOR GAS PERMEABLE CELL CULTURE PROCESS | [2016/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF À SYSTÈME CLOS ET PROCÉDÉS DE PROCESSUS DE CULTURE DE CELLULES PERMÉABLE AUX GAZ | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 10.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005032211 (SHAALTIEL YOSEPH [IL]); | [A]US2005054028 (TEICH JAY S [US], et al); | [A]US2009130704 (GYURE DALE C [US]); | [A]CN201686685U (QING SHI); | [A]US2012122201 (BUTLER STEPHEN JAMES [GB], et al); | [A]US2013102075 (VERA JUAN F [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2010042260 (ANTWILER GLEN DELBERT [US]); | [A]US7956164 (HAR-NOY MICHAEL [IL]); | [A]WO2011142667 (XPAND BIOTECHNOLOGY B V [NL], et al); | [A]US2012077243 (NIAZI SARFARAZ K [US]); | [A]US2013102075 (VERA JUAN F [US], et al) |