EP3083013 - METHOD FOR PREPARING A SORBENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Matthey Public Limited Company 5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street London EC4A 4AB / GB | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVANS, Matthew James 1A Abbey Road Darlington Durham DL3 7RA / GB | 02 /
FORAN, Paul Thomas 23 Elswick Gardens Mellor Lancashire BB2 7JD / GB | 03 /
LUNN, Matthew David Gwydion 74 Swaledale Avenue Darlington County Durham DL3 9AR / GB | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Ridland, John Johnson Matthey Process Technologies Intellectual Property Department PO Box 1 Belasis Avenue Billingham, Cleveland TS23 1LB / GB | [2016/43] | Application number, filing date | 14819051.5 | 04.12.2014 | [2016/43] | WO2014GB53605 | Priority number, date | GB20130022462 | 18.12.2013 Original published format: GB 201322462 | [2016/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015092358 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3083013 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3083013 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/14, B01J2/00, B01J20/02, B01J20/08, B01J20/28, B01J20/30, B01J20/32, B01J20/12, B01D53/02, B01D53/64 | [2018/40] | CPC: |
B01J20/12 (EP,US);
B01J20/3028 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/0237 (EP,GB,KR,US);
B01D53/02 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/14 (US);
B01D53/64 (EP,GB,KR,US);
B01J20/0233 (GB);
B01J20/0277 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/0285 (EP,GB,KR,US);
B01J20/08 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/2803 (EP,GB,KR,US);
B01J20/3007 (GB);
B01J20/3042 (EP,GB,KR,US);
B01J20/3085 (EP,US);
B01J20/3204 (EP,GB,KR,US);
B01J20/3208 (GB);
B01J20/3236 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/3293 (EP,US);
B01J20/3295 (EP,US);
B01D2252/10 (US);
B01D2253/104 (EP,US);
B01D2253/1128 (EP,US);
B01D2253/25 (US);
B01D2256/16 (EP,US);
B01D2256/20 (EP,US);
B01D2256/24 (EP,US);
B01D2257/602 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/43] | B01D53/14, B01J2/00, B01J20/02, B01J20/08, B01J20/28, B01J20/30, B01J20/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/52] |
Former [2016/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SORPTIONSMITTELS | [2016/43] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING A SORBENT | [2016/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN SORBANT | [2016/43] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 13.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2014 | AL | 06.02.2019 | AT | 06.02.2019 | CY | 06.02.2019 | CZ | 06.02.2019 | EE | 06.02.2019 | ES | 06.02.2019 | FI | 06.02.2019 | HR | 06.02.2019 | IT | 06.02.2019 | LT | 06.02.2019 | LV | 06.02.2019 | MC | 06.02.2019 | MK | 06.02.2019 | MT | 06.02.2019 | NL | 06.02.2019 | PL | 06.02.2019 | RO | 06.02.2019 | RS | 06.02.2019 | SE | 06.02.2019 | SI | 06.02.2019 | SK | 06.02.2019 | SM | 06.02.2019 | TR | 06.02.2019 | BG | 06.05.2019 | GR | 07.05.2019 | IS | 06.06.2019 | PT | 06.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 04.12.2014 | |
AL | 06.02.2019 | ||
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
MT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 04.12.2014 | |
AL | 06.02.2019 | ||
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 06.02.2019 | |
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO2011021024 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB], et al) [YD] 1-25 * claims 1,17,20,21,23-28 * * page 4, line 13 - line 23 * * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 12 * * page 3, line 37 - page 4, line 6 *; | [Y]WO2013045883 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 1-25 * page 5, line 5 - line 32 * |