EP3069479 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IDENTIFYING A PHYSICAL IOT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2016/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERELEJIS, Gabriel Motza Haktana 16 HF 9074815 Mevaseret Zion / IL | 02 /
ZEHAVI, Doron Kibutz Tzora DN Shimshon HF 9980300 Kibbutz Tzora / IL | 03 /
ILSAR, Eyal David 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2016/38] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [2016/38] | Application number, filing date | 14819131.5 | 13.11.2014 | [2016/38] | WO2014US65556 | Priority number, date | US201361904338P | 14.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361904338 P | US201414539302 | 12.11.2014 Original published format: US201414539302 | [2016/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015073730 | Date: | 21.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3069479 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04L29/08 | [2016/38] | CPC: |
H04L12/2807 (EP,US);
H04L67/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04L67/104 (KR);
H04L67/303 (KR);
Y04S40/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINER PHYSIKALISCHEN IOT-VORRICHTUNG | [2016/38] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IDENTIFYING A PHYSICAL IOT DEVICE | [2016/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'IDENTIFIER UN DISPOSITIF IOT PHYSIQUE | [2016/38] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/38] | 05.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 25.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2010311347 (LE THIERRY D ENNEQUIN CHRISTOPHE [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,11,18,20,25 * paragraphs [0003] , [0012] , [0016] , [0018] , [0027] , [0033] , [0034] , [0070] - [0078] - [0082] - [0092] - [0098] - [0109] - [0121] , [0135]; figures 1-7 * [Y] 3-10,12-17,19,21-24,26-30; | [A]US2010317332 (BATHICHE STEVEN N [US], et al) [A] 1-30* the whole document *; | [Y]US2012151034 (WOHLERT RANDOLPH [US], et al) [Y] 3-10,12-17,19,21-24,26-30 * paragraphs [0011] - [0014] - [0 41] - [0052] - [0 54] - [0066] *; | [A]US2013187953 (MATSUMURA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-30 * the whole document * |