EP3017445 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FACILITATING VOICE USER INTERFACE DESIGN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 24/7 Customer, Inc. 910 E. Hamilton Avenue Suite 240 Campbell, CA 95008 / US | [2016/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Kathy, L. 910 E. Hamilton Avenue Suite 240 Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 02 /
SRIVASTAVA, Vaibhav B-402 Fern Saroj Apartments 7th Cross 4th Main Lb Shastri Nagar Bangalore 560 071 / IN | [2016/19] | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2016/19] | Application number, filing date | 14819769.2 | 01.07.2014 | [2016/19] | WO2014US45105 | Priority number, date | US201361842285P | 02.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361842285 P | US201414320516 | 30.06.2014 Original published format: US201414320516 | [2016/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015002982 | Date: | 08.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3017445 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/18, G06F9/44, G06F17/27, G06F3/16 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
G06F8/38 (EP,US);
G06F3/167 (US);
G06F40/20 (EP,US);
G10L15/1815 (US)
|
Former IPC [2016/19] | G10L15/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERLEICHTERTEN EINRICHTUNG EINER SPRACH-BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLE | [2016/19] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FACILITATING VOICE USER INTERFACE DESIGN | [2016/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE FACILITER LA CONCEPTION D'UNE INTERFACE UTILISATEUR VOCALE | [2016/19] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/19] | 18.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/52] | 21.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1669980 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [XI]US2011238410 (LARCHEVEQUE JEAN-MARIE HENRI DANIEL [FR], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0003] , [0032] , [0082] , [0101] , [0126] , [0127] , [0254] , [0255] * [I] 2-15; | [A]WO2012047214 (VIRTUOZ SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0026] , [0030] , [0035] , [0071] , [0073] * | International search | [Y]US2002133394 (BUSHEY ROBERT R [US], et al); | [A]US6526382 (YUSCHIK MATTHEW JOHN [US]); | [A]US2003061029 (SHAKET EFRAIM [IL]); | [A]US2008071533 (CAVE ELLIS K [US], et al); | [Y]US2008133245 (PROULX GUILLAUME [US], et al); | [A]US2009043583 (AGAPI CIPRIAN [US], et al); | [A]US7831426 (BENNETT IAN M [US]); | [A]US7920682 (BYRNE WILLIAM J [US], et al); | [A]US8315874 (BARTON WILLIAM F [US], et al); | [A]US8380511 (CAVE ELLIS K [US], et al); | [T]US8699674 (BOUZID AHMED TEWFIK [US], et al) |