EP3023180 - SURFACE-COATED BORON NITRIDE SINTERED BODY TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/21] | SURFACE-COATED BORON NITRIDE SINTERED TOOL | ||
[2022/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Hardmetal Corp. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | [2016/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUKIHARA, Nozomi c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC HARDMETAL CORP. 1-1 Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | 02 /
OKAMURA, Katsumi c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC HARDMETAL CORP. 1-1 Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | 03 /
SETOYAMA, Makoto c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC HARDMETAL CORP. 1-1 Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | [2016/21] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/21] | Application number, filing date | 14819914.4 | 05.06.2014 | [2016/21] | WO2014JP64957 | Priority number, date | JP20130139797 | 03.07.2013 Original published format: JP 2013139797 | [2016/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015001903 | Date: | 08.01.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3023180 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3023180 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C04B41/89, C04B41/00, C04B41/52, C04B35/645, C04B35/58, C04B35/63, C23C14/06, C04B37/02, C23C28/04, C04B35/581 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
C04B41/89 (EP,US);
C04B35/5611 (US);
C04B35/58014 (EP,US);
C04B35/58021 (EP,US);
C04B35/581 (EP,US);
C04B35/6303 (EP,US);
C04B35/645 (EP,US);
C04B37/026 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/52 (EP,US);
C23C14/0641 (EP,US);
C23C14/0664 (EP,US);
C23C28/042 (EP,US);
C23C28/044 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3843 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3856 (EP,US);
C04B2235/386 (US);
C04B2235/3886 (EP,US);
C04B2235/402 (EP,US);
C04B2235/404 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/80 (EP,US);
C04B2237/122 (EP,US);
C04B2237/361 (EP,US);
C04B2237/401 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/5831 (EP,US);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4529, C04B41/5053 (US,EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4529, C04B41/5057, C04B41/5063 (US,EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4529, C04B41/5059, C04B41/5061, C04B41/5066, C04B41/5068 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2016/21] | B23B27/14, B23B27/20, C04B35/583, C04B41/87 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENBESCHICHTETES BORNITRID-SINTERWERKZEUG | [2016/21] | English: | SURFACE-COATED BORON NITRIDE SINTERED BODY TOOL | [2022/13] | French: | OUTIL FRITTÉ DE NITRURE DE BORE À SURFACE REVÊTUE | [2022/13] |
Former [2016/21] | SURFACE-COATED BORON NITRIDE SINTERED TOOL | ||
Former [2016/21] | OUTIL FRITTÉ AU NITRURE DE BORE À SURFACE REVÊTUE | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2015 | Translation filed | 30.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/21] | 31.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 31.08.2022 | AT | 31.08.2022 | CZ | 31.08.2022 | DK | 31.08.2022 | EE | 31.08.2022 | ES | 31.08.2022 | FI | 31.08.2022 | HR | 31.08.2022 | IT | 31.08.2022 | LT | 31.08.2022 | LV | 31.08.2022 | MC | 31.08.2022 | NL | 31.08.2022 | RO | 31.08.2022 | RS | 31.08.2022 | SI | 31.08.2022 | SK | 31.08.2022 | SM | 31.08.2022 | NO | 30.11.2022 | GR | 01.12.2022 | IS | 31.12.2022 | PT | 02.01.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/09] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
MC | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 31.08.2022 | |
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5330853 (HOFMANN DIETER [DE], et al) [Y] 3,4 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 11 * * column 4, line 46 - line 56 *; | [Y]EP0714719 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 1-18 * figure 12D; tables 5-7 *; | [Y]WO0136711 (KERR CORP [US]) [Y] 16-18 * page 10, line 7 - page 12, line 12 *; | [Y]EP1736307 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-18 * paragraphs [0054] , [0055] , [0105] - [0107]; figures 1,4; claims 7,20 *; | [A]EP2000237 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO2010140959 (SECO TOOLS AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9,14,15 * Coating 6; page 2, line 30 - line 40; figure 1; examples 1-5; tables 1,2 * [Y] 3,4,10-13,16-18; | [A]US2012234143 (FONTAINE FREDERIC [CH], et al) [A] 1-18* paragraphs [0020] , [0022] - [0025] - [0029] *; | [Y]EP2591869 (TUNGALOY CORP [JP]) [Y] 10-13 * paragraph [0020] * | International search | [A]JP2008254159 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP); | [A]WO2011129422 (TUNGALOY CORP [JP], et al); | [A]WO2012005275 (TUNGALOY CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2008188689 | JP2008534297 | WO2010150335 | WO2012005275 |