EP3031465 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR PROMOTING BONE TISSUE FORMATION, CONTAINING STAUNTONIA HEXAPHYLLA LEAF EXTRACT AS ACTIVE INGREDIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jeonnam Bioindustry Foundation 30-5, Dongsunonggongdanji-gil, Naju-si Jeollanam-do 520-330 / KR | For all designated states Yungjin Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 1057, Cheonho-daero Gangdong-gu Seoul 134-721 / KR | [2016/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Chul Yung 105-203,10 Pungamsunhwan-ro Seo-gu Gwangju 62056 / KR | 02 /
PAN, Sang O 23, Pyeonggyo-ro 29beon-gil Buk-gu Gwangju 61172 / KR | 03 /
SEOL, Hee Jin 1-208, 73 Seoksil-ro 260beon-gil Wolmun-ri, Wabu-eup Namyangju-si Gyeonggi-do 12203 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Gyu Ok 101-404, 136 Udeuraendeu-gil Usan-ri, Jangheung-eup Jangheung-gun Jeollanam-do 59337 / KR | 05 /
JANG, Wook Jin 3492 Jangheung-daero Jangheung-eup Jangheung-gun Jeollanam-do 59327 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Hee Sook 337-8 Guman-ro Gaecheon-myeon Goseong-gun Gyeongsangnam-do 52904 / KR | 07 /
KIM, Jae Yong 304-207, 60 Wanggung-gil Suncheon-si Jeollanam-do 57970 / KR | 08 /
KANG, Hu Won 205-7, Yeongsanpo-ro Naju-si Jeollanam-do 58266 / KR | 09 /
LEE, Dong Wook 203, 39 Bukbu-ro Jangheung-eup Jangheung-gun Jeollanam-do 59320 / KR | 10 /
KIM, Sun Oh 201-1003, 52, Yangil-ro Buk-gu Gwangju 61091 / KR | 11 /
KIM, Jae Gap 2-507, 51, Gyeongin-ro 134beon-gil Sosa-gu Bucheon-si Gyeonggi-do 14735 / KR | 12 /
PARK, Joon Yung 68 Eojinnuri-gil Muan-gun Jeollanam-do 58564 / KR | [2017/34] |
Former [2017/32] | 01 /
CHOI, Chul Yung 105-203,10 Pungamsunhwan-ro Seo-gu Gwangju 62056 / KR | ||
02 /
PAN, Sang O 23, Pyeonggyo-ro 29beon-gil Buk-gu Gwangju 61172 / KR | |||
03 /
SEOL, Hee Jin 1-208, 73 Seoksil-ro 260beon-gil Wolmun-ri, Wabu-eup Namyangiu-si Gyeonggi-do 12203 / KR | |||
04 /
LEE, Gyu Ok 101-404, 136 Udeuraendeu-gil Usan-ri, Jangheung-eup Jangheung-gun Jeollanam-do 59337 / KR | |||
05 /
JANG, Wook Jin 3492 Jangheung-daero Jangheung-eup Jangheung-gun Jeollanam-do 59327 / KR | |||
06 /
KIM, Hee Sook 337-8 Guman-ro Gaecheon-myeon Goseong-gun Gyeongsangnam-do 52904 / KR | |||
07 /
KIM, Jae Yong 304-207, 60 Wanggung-gil Suncheon-si Jeollanam-do 57970 / KR | |||
08 /
KANG, Hu Won 205-7, Yeongsanpo-ro Naju-si Jeollanam-do 58266 / KR | |||
09 /
LEE, Dong Wook 203, 39 Bukbu-ro Jangheung-eup Jangheung-gun Jeollanam-do 59320 / KR | |||
10 /
KIM, Sun Oh 201-1003, 52, Yangil-ro Buk-gu Gwangju 61091 / KR | |||
11 /
KIM, Jae Gap 2-507, 51, Gyeongin-ro 134beon-gil Sosa-gu Bucheon-si Gyeonggi-do 14735 / KR | |||
12 /
PARK, Joon Yung 68 Eojinnuri-gil Muan-gun Jeollanam-do 58564 / KR | |||
Former [2016/24] | 01 /
CHOI, Chul Yung 105-203,10 Pungamsunhwan-ro Seo-gu Gwangju 62056 / KR | ||
02 /
PAN, Sang O 23, Pyeonggyo-ro 29beon-gil Buk-gu Gwangju 61172 / KR | |||
03 /
SEOL, Hee Jin 96-14, Bongseon 2-ro Nam-gu Gwangju 61686 / KR | |||
04 /
LEE, Gyu Ok 136, Udeuraendeu-gil Jangheung-eup Jangheung-gun Jeollanam-do 59337 / KR | |||
05 /
JANG, Wook Jin 3492 Jangheung-daero Jangheung-eup Jangheung-gun Jeollanam-do 59327 / KR | |||
06 /
KIM, Hee Sook 337-8 Guman-ro Gaecheon-myeon Goseong-gun Gyeongsangnam-do 52904 / KR | |||
07 /
KIM, Jae Yong 60 Wanggung-gil Suncheon-si Jeollanam-do 57970 / KR | |||
08 /
KANG, Hu Won 205-7, Yeongsanpo-ro Naju-si Jeollanam-do 58266 / KR | |||
09 /
LEE, Dong Wook 203, 39 Bukbu-ro Jangheung-eup Jangheung-gun Jeollanam-do 59320 / KR | |||
10 /
KIM, Sun Oh 201-1003, 52, Yangil-ro Buk-gu Gwangju 61091 / KR | |||
11 /
KIM, Jae Gap 2-507, 51, Gyeongin-ro 134beon-gil Sosa-gu Bucheon-si Gyeonggi-do 14735 / KR | |||
12 /
PARK, Joon Yung 68 Eojinnuri-gil Muan-gun Jeollanam-do 58564 / KR | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/46] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2016/24] | Brown, David Leslie Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 14819974.8 | 29.04.2014 | [2016/24] | WO2014KR03742 | Priority number, date | KR20130076190 | 30.06.2013 Original published format: KR 20130076190 | [2016/24] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015002378 | Date: | 08.01.2015 | Language: | KO | [2015/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3031465 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3031465 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/71, A61K9/16, A61K9/20, A61P19/00 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
A61K36/185 (EP,US);
A61K36/71 (EP,KR,US);
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
A61K9/16 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/20 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER BILDUNG VON KNOCHENGEWEBE MIT BLATTEXTRAKT AUS STAUNTONIA HEXAPHYLLA ALS WIRKSTOFF | [2016/24] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR PROMOTING BONE TISSUE FORMATION, CONTAINING STAUNTONIA HEXAPHYLLA LEAF EXTRACT AS ACTIVE INGREDIENT | [2016/24] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE POUR FAVORISER LA FORMATION DE TISSU OSSEUX, CONTENANT UN EXTRAIT DE FEUILLE DE STAUNTONIA HEXAPHYLLA COMME PRINCIPE ACTIF | [2016/24] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2015 | Translation filed | 03.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 03.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/24] | 24.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.04.2014 | AL | 13.11.2019 | AT | 13.11.2019 | CY | 13.11.2019 | CZ | 13.11.2019 | DK | 13.11.2019 | EE | 13.11.2019 | FI | 13.11.2019 | HR | 13.11.2019 | LT | 13.11.2019 | LV | 13.11.2019 | MC | 13.11.2019 | MK | 13.11.2019 | MT | 13.11.2019 | NL | 13.11.2019 | RO | 13.11.2019 | RS | 13.11.2019 | SE | 13.11.2019 | SI | 13.11.2019 | SK | 13.11.2019 | SM | 13.11.2019 | BG | 13.02.2020 | NO | 13.02.2020 | GR | 14.02.2020 | IS | 13.03.2020 | PT | 13.03.2020 | IE | 29.04.2020 | LU | 29.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 29.04.2014 | |
AL | 13.11.2019 | ||
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CY | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
MT | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
IE | 29.04.2020 | ||
LU | 29.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
IE | 29.04.2020 | ||
LU | 29.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
LU | 29.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 13.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]KR101221617B (JEONNAM BIOINDUSTRY FOUNDATION [KR]) [XD] 1-8 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraphs [0044] , [0058] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052] *; | [XD]KR20130020095 (JEONNAM BIOINDUSTRY FOUNDATION [KR]) [XD] 1-8 * claims 1-7 * * paragraphs [0034] , [0058] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] *; | [XD]KR101243115B (JEONNAM BIOINDUSTRY FOUNDATION [KR]) [XD] 1-7 * paragraph [0032]; claims 1-2 * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] *; | [XP]KR101317668B (JEONNAM BIOINDUSTRY FOUNDATION [KR]) [XP] 1-8 * paragraphs [0041] , [0065]; claims 1-3 * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058]; figures 8-9 ** paragraph [0129] - paragraph [0138] * | International search | [A]KR101221617B (JEONNAM BIOINDUSTRY FOUNDATION [KR]); | [A]KR20130020095 (JEONNAM BIOINDUSTRY FOUNDATION [KR]); | [A]KR101243115B (JEONNAM BIOINDUSTRY FOUNDATION [KR]); | [A] - HUAI-BIN WANG ET AL., "TRITERPENOID GLYCOSIDES FROM STAUNTONIA HEXAPHYLLA", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (19931101), vol. 34, no. 5, pages 1389 - 1394, XP026631130 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-9422(91)80035-Y | [A] - HUAI-BIN WANG, "BISEPOXYLIGNAN GLYCOSIDES FROM STAUNTONIA HEXAPHYLLA", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (19931201), vol. 34, no. 6, pages 1621 - 1624, XP026631691 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-9422(00)90857-4 | by applicant | KR101167589B | KR101221617B | KR20130020095 | KR101243115B |