EP3017417 - DYNAMIC GENERATION OF ORDER ENTRY FIELDS ON A TRADING INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trading Technologies International, Inc. 222 S. Riverside Plaza, Suite 1100 Chicago, Illinois 60606 / US | [2016/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCK, Brian, J. 2369 Senger Street Livermore, CA 94550 / US | [2016/19] | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/19] | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 14820251.8 | 19.06.2014 | [2016/19] | WO2014US43233 | Priority number, date | US201313935208 | 03.07.2013 Original published format: US201313935208 | [2016/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015002748 | Date: | 08.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3017417 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q40/04 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
G06Q40/04 (EP,US);
G06Q30/08 (EP,US);
G06Q40/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/19] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE ERZEUGUNG VON AUFTRAGSEINTRAGSFELDERN AUF EINER BÖRSENHANDELSSCHNITTSTELLE | [2016/19] | English: | DYNAMIC GENERATION OF ORDER ENTRY FIELDS ON A TRADING INTERFACE | [2016/19] | French: | GÉNÉRATION DYNAMIQUE DE CHAMPS DE SAISIE D'ORDRE SUR UNE INTERFACE DE NÉGOCE | [2016/19] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 03.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/19] | 31.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.11.2020 | 19.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/16] | 13.12.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2011270732 (RITTER MATTHEW T [US], et al); | [I]US2012290465 (KLINE ROBERT J [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2006155626 (WIGZELL SIMON [SE]); | [A]US2007150401 (BRUCATO STEVEN J [US], et al); | [X]US2012303513 (BUCK BRIAN J [US]); | [A]US2012303507 (ARNOLD JASON [US], et al) |