EP3002975 - HOME NETWORK DEVICE AND METHOD OF PROXY SERVICE DISCOVERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2017/33] |
Former [2016/14] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Lin c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Boshan c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2016/14] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/14] | Awapatent AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | Application number, filing date | 14820450.6 | 21.04.2014 | [2016/14] | WO2014CN75767 | Priority number, date | CN201310272226 | 01.07.2013 Original published format: CN201310272226 | [2016/14] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015000326 | Date: | 08.01.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3002975 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3002975 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02, H04L29/06, // H04W8/00, H04W88/04, H04L29/08, H04W4/18 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
H04W52/0212 (EP,US);
H04L67/51 (EP,US);
H04L67/56 (US);
H04L69/24 (EP,US);
Y02D30/00 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/14] | H04W52/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEIMNETZWERKVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR PROXY-DIENST-ENTDECKUNG | [2016/14] | English: | HOME NETWORK DEVICE AND METHOD OF PROXY SERVICE DISCOVERING | [2016/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU RÉSIDENTIEL ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCOUVERTE DE SERVICE DE MANDATAIRE | [2016/14] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2015 | Translation filed | 29.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/14] | 06.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.04.2014 | AL | 16.08.2017 | AT | 16.08.2017 | CY | 16.08.2017 | CZ | 16.08.2017 | DK | 16.08.2017 | EE | 16.08.2017 | ES | 16.08.2017 | FI | 16.08.2017 | HR | 16.08.2017 | IT | 16.08.2017 | LT | 16.08.2017 | LV | 16.08.2017 | MC | 16.08.2017 | MK | 16.08.2017 | NL | 16.08.2017 | PL | 16.08.2017 | PT | 16.08.2017 | RO | 16.08.2017 | RS | 16.08.2017 | SE | 16.08.2017 | SI | 16.08.2017 | SK | 16.08.2017 | SM | 16.08.2017 | TR | 16.08.2017 | BG | 16.11.2017 | NO | 16.11.2017 | GR | 17.11.2017 | IS | 16.12.2017 | GB | 21.04.2018 | IE | 21.04.2018 | LU | 21.04.2018 | MT | 21.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 21.04.2014 | |
AT | 16.08.2017 | ||
CY | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
HR | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
MK | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PT | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
GB | 21.04.2018 | ||
IE | 21.04.2018 | ||
LU | 21.04.2018 | ||
MT | 21.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 21.04.2014 | |
AT | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
HR | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PT | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
GB | 21.04.2018 | ||
IE | 21.04.2018 | ||
LU | 21.04.2018 | ||
MT | 21.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PT | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
GB | 21.04.2018 | ||
IE | 21.04.2018 | ||
LU | 21.04.2018 | ||
MT | 21.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
GB | 21.04.2018 | ||
IE | 21.04.2018 | ||
LU | 21.04.2018 | ||
MT | 21.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
GB | 21.04.2018 | ||
IE | 21.04.2018 | ||
LU | 21.04.2018 | ||
MT | 21.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
GB | 21.04.2018 | ||
IE | 21.04.2018 | ||
LU | 21.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
GB | 21.04.2018 | ||
LU | 21.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 16.08.2017 | |
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 16.08.2017 | |
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 16.08.2017 | |
NO | 16.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006265473 (MUTO SHIN [JP]) [X] 1,9,12 * figures 1, 3 * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0053] * [I] 2-8,10,11,13-15; | [XAI]US2007250590 (FLANNERY ELIOT J [US], et al) [X] 1,9,12 * figures 3, 5, 6, 9 * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0045] * [A] 6-8,11,15[I] 2-5,10,13,14; | [XI]US2009240794 (LIU HUAIYU [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9,10,12,13 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0020] * [I] 4,6-8,11,14,15; | [XI]US2010322213 (LIU HUAIYU [US], et al) [X] 1,9,12 * figures 1, 3, 10 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0061] * [I] 2-8,10,11,13-15 | International search | [X]CN1788247 (CANON KK [JP]); | [X]CN1823495 (APPLE COMPUTER [US]); | [X]CN1833214 (CANON KK [JP]); | [X]CN101572938 (INTEL CORP [US]); | [X]CN102571507 (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD) |