06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
16.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
02.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
29.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
08.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
20.08.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
30.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
11.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
21.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
10.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
23.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
11.09.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.10.2020 [2020/42] |
09.09.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
09.09.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.09.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.05.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.04.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.06.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.11.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.09.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.06.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.05.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.05.2018 |
First examination report |
|
13.09.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.02.2017 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
10.02.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
10.02.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
16.11.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
09.09.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] |
14.06.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.04.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.05.2016 [2016/19] |
08.04.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.05.2016 [2016/19] |
17.02.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.01.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.12.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
22.12.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.01.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|