06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
16.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
06.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
25.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
31.12.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.02.2022 [2022/05] |
19.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
05.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
29.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
15.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
17.09.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.2021 [2021/42] |
27.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] |
20.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
30.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
22.01.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
15.01.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
15.01.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.01.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.12.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.12.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
28.09.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.09.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.10.2020 [2020/43] |
18.09.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.10.2020 [2020/43] |
18.01.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.11.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.07.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.07.2019 |
First examination report |
|
01.05.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
12.01.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.02.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
13.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.09.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] |
23.09.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] |
03.08.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.07.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.07.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.07.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
08.07.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.07.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.06.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.01.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|