Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11162505 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2021 | B2 | US2016312791 | 27.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP77707 | 15.12.2014 | ITCO20130067 | 17.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016540926 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP77707 | 15.12.2014 | ITCO20130067 | 17.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106062376 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP77707 | 15.12.2014 | ITCO20130067 | 17.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3084228 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2021 | B1 | EP3084228 | 26.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP77707 | 15.12.2014 | ITCO20130067 | 17.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2682212 | 15.03.2019 | C1 | RU2016122901 | 23.01.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP77707 | 15.12.2014 | ITCO20130067 | 17.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015091330 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITCO20130067 | 17.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6847161B | Global Dossier | 24.03.2021 | B2 | JP2019206967 | 05.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | ITCO20130067 | 17.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ITCO20130067 | 18.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITCO20130067 | 17.12.2013 |