EP3083729 - SURFACTANT RESPONSIVE EMULSION POLYMERIZATION MICRO-GELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lubrizol Advanced Materials, Inc. 9911 Brecksville Road Cleveland, OH 44141-3247 / US | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HSU, Shui-Jen Raymond 9911 Brecksville Road Cleveland, Ohio 44141-3247 / US | 02 /
CHARI, Krishnan 9911 Brecksville Road Cleveland, Ohio 44141-3247 / US | 03 /
LI, Sinan 9911 Brecksville Road Cleveland, Ohio 44141-3247 / US | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2016/43] | Application number, filing date | 14822032.0 | 17.12.2014 | [2016/43] | WO2014US70769 | Priority number, date | US201361917069P | 17.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361917069 P | [2016/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015095286 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3083729 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3083729 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/18, C09K8/12, C08F216/12 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
C09K8/035 (EP,KR,US);
C08F216/125 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/18 (US);
C08F220/20 (EP,KR,US);
C08J3/075 (KR);
C08J3/124 (KR);
C08K3/34 (KR);
C08K5/0025 (KR);
C08K5/053 (KR);
C08K5/06 (KR);
C09K8/12 (KR,US);
C09K8/602 (KR,US);
C09K8/604 (EP,KR,US);
C09K8/685 (EP,KR,US);
C09K8/882 (EP,KR,US);
C09K8/887 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/1802 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/1804 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F220/1802, C08F220/1804, C08F220/20, C08F220/286 (EP);
C08F220/1802, C08F220/1804, C08F220/20, C08F220/286, C08F216/125 (EP);
C08F220/1802, C08F220/1804, C08F220/20, C08F220/286, C08F220/56 (EP);
C08F220/1802, C08F220/1804, C08F226/10, C08F220/286 (EP);
C08F220/18, C08F220/1804, C08F220/20, C08F220/286 (US);
C08F220/18, C08F220/1804, C08F220/20, C08F220/286, C08F216/125 (US);
C08F220/18, C08F220/1804, C08F220/20, C08F220/286, C08F220/56 (US);
C08F220/18, C08F220/1804, C08F226/10, C08F220/286 (US);
C08F220/20, C08F220/1802, C08F220/1804, C08F220/286 (US,KR,EP);
C08F220/20, C08F220/1802, C08F220/1804, C08F220/286, C08F220/56 (US,KR,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TENSIDREAKTIVE EMULSIONSPOLYMERISATIONSMIKROGELE | [2016/43] | English: | SURFACTANT RESPONSIVE EMULSION POLYMERIZATION MICRO-GELS | [2016/43] | French: | MICROGELS POLYMÉRISÉS EN ÉMULSION SENSIBLES AUX TENSIOACTIFS | [2016/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 07.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 27.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.12.2014 | AL | 03.05.2017 | AT | 03.05.2017 | CY | 03.05.2017 | CZ | 03.05.2017 | DK | 03.05.2017 | EE | 03.05.2017 | ES | 03.05.2017 | FI | 03.05.2017 | HR | 03.05.2017 | LT | 03.05.2017 | LV | 03.05.2017 | MC | 03.05.2017 | MK | 03.05.2017 | NL | 03.05.2017 | PL | 03.05.2017 | PT | 03.05.2017 | RO | 03.05.2017 | RS | 03.05.2017 | SE | 03.05.2017 | SI | 03.05.2017 | SK | 03.05.2017 | SM | 03.05.2017 | TR | 03.05.2017 | BG | 03.08.2017 | NO | 03.08.2017 | GR | 04.08.2017 | IS | 03.09.2017 | IE | 17.12.2017 | LU | 17.12.2017 | MT | 17.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 17.12.2014 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PT | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 17.12.2014 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 17.12.2014 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 17.12.2014 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/41] | HU | 17.12.2014 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/37] | HU | 17.12.2014 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.12.2014 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO02100525 (SYNGENTA LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-80* page 32; claim - *; | [A]WO03010124 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-80 * claim - *; | [A]WO2013040174 (LUBRIZOL ADVANCED MAT INC [US], et al) [A] 1-80 * the whole document * | by applicant | US33156 | US2798053 | US2858281 | US3032538 | US3541138 | US4284532 | US4285841 | US4384096 | US4421902 | US4514552 | US4600761 | US4616074 | US4722962 | US4758641 | US5011978 | US5139770 | US5292843 | US5294692 | US5412142 | US5527892 | US5663258 | US5770760 | US5770543 | US6262152 | WO02100525 | US6573375 | US6635702 | US6645476 | US6727357 | US7378479 | US7786027 | US8354488 | US2013047892 | US2014114006 | - DALMONT; PINPRAYOON; SAUNDERS, LANGMUIR, (2008), vol. 24, page 2834 | - SENFF; RICHTERING, JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL PHYSICS, (1999), vol. 111, page 1705 | - WU; ZHOU, JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE: PART B: POLYMER PHYSICS, (1996), vol. 34, page 1597 | - HIDI; NAPPER; SANGSTER, MACROMOLECULES, (1995), vol. 28, page 6042 | - KIRK-OTHMER, Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, vol. 23, pages 478 - 541 | - McCutcheon's Detergents and Emulsifiers | - McCutcheon's, Functional Materials |