EP3019523 - METHODS OF TREATMENT FOR ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE AND HUNTINGTON'S DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Annexon, Inc. 280 Utah Street, Suite 110 South San Francisco, CA 94083-6883 / US | For all designated states Children's Medical Center Corporation 55 Shattuck Street Boston, MA 02115 / US | [2016/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSENTHAL, Arnon 150 Normandy Lane Woodside, CA 94062 / US | 02 /
LEVITEN, Michael 502 Live Oak Lane Emerald Hills, CA 94062 / US | 03 /
STEVENS, Beth c/o Boston Children's Hospital 300 Longwood Avenue Boston, MA 02115 / US | 04 /
HONG, Soyon c/o Boston Children's Hospital 300 Longwood Avenue Boston, MA 02115 / US | 05 /
WILTON, Daniel c/o Boston Children's Hospital 300 Longwood Avenue Boston, MA 02115 / US | [2016/46] |
Former [2016/22] | 01 /
ROSENTHAL, Arnon 150 Normandy Lane Woodside, CA 94062 / US | ||
02 /
LEVITEN, Michael 2850 Middlefied Rd B-213 Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | |||
03 /
STEVENS, Beth c/o Boston Children's Hospital 300 Longwood Avenue Boston, MA 02115 / US | |||
04 /
HONG, Soyon c/o Boston Children's Hospital 300 Longwood Avenue Boston, MA 02115 / US | |||
05 /
WILTON, Daniel c/o Boston Children's Hospital 300 Longwood Avenue Boston, MA 02115 / US | |||
Former [2016/20] | 01 /
ROSENTHAL, Arnon 150 Normandy Lane Woodside, CA 94062 / US | ||
02 /
LEVITEN, Michael 3166 Bryant Street Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | |||
03 /
STEVENS, Beth c/o Boston Children's Hospital 300 Longwood Avenue Boston, MA 02115 / US | |||
04 /
HONG, Soyon c/o Boston Children's Hospital 300 Longwood Avenue Boston, MA 02115 / US | |||
05 /
WILTON, Daniel c/o Boston Children's Hospital 300 Longwood Avenue Boston, MA 02115 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/20] | Application number, filing date | 14822330.8 | 09.07.2014 | [2016/20] | WO2014US46045 | Priority number, date | US201361844369P | 09.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361844369 P | US201361871813P | 29.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361871813 P | [2016/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015006507 | Date: | 15.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3019523 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/00, C07K16/18, C07K16/40, A61K39/00, C07K16/28 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
C07K16/18 (EP,IL,MX,US);
A61K49/0004 (IL,US);
C07K16/40 (IL,MX,US);
A61P1/04 (EP,IL);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP,IL);
A61P13/12 (EP,IL);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP,IL);
A61P25/00 (EP,IL);
A61P25/14 (EP,IL);
A61P25/16 (EP,IL);
A61P25/28 (EP,IL);
A61P27/02 (EP,IL);
A61P27/06 (EP,IL);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP,IL);
A61P3/04 (EP,IL);
A61P3/10 (EP,IL);
A61P37/02 (EP,IL);
A61P37/06 (EP,IL);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP,IL);
A61P9/10 (EP,IL);
G01N33/56966 (IL,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,US);
A61K2039/507 (IL,MX,US);
C07K2317/14 (IL,US);
C07K2317/20 (IL,MX,US);
C07K2317/24 (IL,US);
C07K2317/31 (IL,MX,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,IL,MX,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,IL,MX,US);
C07K2317/54 (IL,US);
C07K2317/55 (IL,US);
C07K2317/56 (IL,US);
C07K2317/734 (IL,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,IL,MX,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/20] | C07K16/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MORBUS ALZHEIMER UND MORBUS HUNTINGTON | [2016/20] | English: | METHODS OF TREATMENT FOR ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE AND HUNTINGTON'S DISEASE | [2016/20] | French: | MÉTHODES PERMETTANT DE TRAITER LA MALADIE D'ALZHEIMER ET LA MALADIE DE HUNTINGTON | [2016/20] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/20] | 29.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/01] | 11.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2016 | 31.07.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8502261 (ORTHO DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [A]US2003170781 (HOLLOWAY JAMES L [US], et al); | [A]WO2005002513 (BRIGHAM & WOMENS HOSPITAL [US], et al); | [A]US2007135753 (BARRES BEN A [US], et al); | [A]US2011104156 (CHRISTADOSS PREMKUMAR [US], et al); | [XYI]US2012328601 (BARRES BEN A [US], et al); | International search | [Y]US2004248156 (HU TIANHUA [US], et al); | [A]US8025878 (GELLERFORS PAER [SE], et al); | [A]EP1774972 (ALLTECH INC [US]); | [X]US2012328601 (BARRES BEN A [US], et al); |