EP3021287 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING STEREO INFORMATION ABOUT A VIEWED SPACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY "3D TV TECHNICS" ul. 7-y Lazenki, 12 Moscow 119619 / RU | [2016/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOBOLEV, Sergey Aleksandrovich ul. 7-y Lazenki, 12-B-401 Moscow, 119619 / RU | [2016/20] | Representative(s) | Chimini, Francesco Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria 11 25122 Brescia / IT | [2016/20] | Application number, filing date | 14823343.0 | 30.06.2014 | [2016/20] | WO2014RU00472 | Priority number, date | RU20130131263 | 09.07.2013 Original published format: RU 2013131263 | [2016/20] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015005826 | Date: | 15.01.2015 | Language: | RU | [2015/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3021287 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 15.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/08, H04N13/00, H04N13/02 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
H04N13/167 (EP,US);
H04N13/194 (EP,US);
H04N13/243 (EP,US);
H04N13/351 (US);
H04N2013/0081 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/20] | G06T15/08, H04N13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON STEREOINFORMATIONEN ÜBER EINEN BETRACHTETEN RAUM | [2016/20] | English: | METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING STEREO INFORMATION ABOUT A VIEWED SPACE | [2016/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION DE D'INFORMATIONS STÉRÉOSCOPIES SUR L'ESPACE OBSERVÉ | [2016/20] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2016 | Translation filed | 09.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/20] | 17.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 28.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/31] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.03.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 12.03.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.07.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.09.2016 | 30.06.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]RU2421933 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]RU2421933 (KORPORATSIYA SAMSUNG ELEKTRONIKS KO., LTD); | [A]RU2474973 (EZHOV VASILY ALEKSANDROVICH); | [A]WO2011029209 (LIBEROVISION AG); | [A]RU2322771 (ARSENICH SVYATOSLAV IVANOVICH); | [A]WO2012070010 (STER-GEN HIGH-TECH LTD.) | by applicant | RU2065133 | RU2192104 |