EP2998704 - DRIVING SUPPORT SYSTEM, METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aisin AW Co., Ltd. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi 444-1192 / JP | [2016/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEUCHI, Masashi c/o AW SOFTWARE CO. LTD. 1-6, Techno Park 2-chome Shimonopporo Atsubetsu-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 004-0015 / JP | [2016/12] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/12] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 14823602.9 | 16.06.2014 | [2016/12] | WO2014JP65841 | Priority number, date | JP20130146823 | 12.07.2013 Original published format: JP 2013146823 | [2016/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015005062 | Date: | 15.01.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2998704 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/34, G08G1/137, G09B29/10, G01C21/36 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
G01C21/3415 (EP,US);
G01C21/3461 (US);
G01C21/3691 (EP,US);
G09B29/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/12] | G01C21/34, G08G1/137, G09B29/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] | Title | German: | FAHRUNTERSTÜTZUNGSSYSTEM, -VERFAHREN UND -PROGRAMM | [2016/12] | English: | DRIVING SUPPORT SYSTEM, METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2016/12] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AIDE À LA CONDUITE, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME | [2016/12] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2015 | Translation filed | 16.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 06.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/25] | 12.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004088109 (MIYASHITA JUN [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005256639 (ALEKSIC MARIO [DE], et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [X]US2006224302 (KWOK WING F [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * figures 2,3,5,6 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0 18] - [0031] - [0 50] - [0051] * | International search | [Y]JPH11344349 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2000346664 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2003344073 (DENSO CORP); | [Y]JP2004286454 (ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC); | [A]WO2007010933 (PIONEER CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2007147577 (AISIN AW CO); | [A]JP2010281589 (ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC); | [X]JP2011064628 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) | by applicant | JPH10260054 |