EP3083072 - LIQUID DROPLET APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VON HOLLEN, Dirk Ernest c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Freeke, Arnold Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/43] | Application number, filing date | 14824425.4 | 16.12.2014 | [2016/43] | WO2014EP78080 | Priority number, date | EP20130198579 | 19.12.2013 Original published format: EP 13198579 | [2016/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015091564 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3083072 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B05B17/00 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
B05B17/0646 (EP,RU,US);
B05B17/0653 (US);
A61M11/005 (US);
A61M16/0054 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGTRÖPFCHENVORRICHTUNG | [2016/43] | English: | LIQUID DROPLET APPARATUS | [2016/43] | French: | APPAREIL À GOUTTELETTES LIQUIDES | [2016/43] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 19.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0657226 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [Y]US2006226253 (WANG YU-RAN [TW], et al) | Examination | US5518179 | EP2159254 |