EP3092158 - METHOD TO CONTROL THE BRAKE SYSTEM OF A TRACTOR-TRAILER COMBINATION, AND BRAKE SYSTEM CONTROLLED ACCORDING TO THAT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/46] | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A BRAKE MECHANISM IN A TRACTOR VEHICLE-TRAILER COMBINATION, AND BRAKE MECHANISM CONTROLLED ACCORDING TO SAID METHOD | ||
[2020/03] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [2016/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCHNER, Hermann Niederharthausen 4 94330 Aiterhofen / DE | 02 /
ALTER, Wolfgang Lechfeldstrasse 17 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | 03 /
FINKL, Florian Gertrud-Grunow Strasse 52 80807 München / DE | 04 /
ARENS, Kai Demleitnerstrasse 3 81371 München / DE | [2016/46] | Application number, filing date | 14824460.1 | 19.12.2014 | [2016/46] | WO2014EP78682 | Priority number, date | DE201410100069 | 07.01.2014 Original published format: DE102014100069 | [2016/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015104168 | Date: | 16.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3092158 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B60T7/20, B60T8/17, B60T13/66 | [2016/46] | CPC: |
B60T7/20 (EP,US);
B60T13/662 (EP,US);
B60T13/683 (EP,US);
B60T8/1708 (EP,US);
B60T2260/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINER BREMSEINRICHTUNG EINER ZUGFAHRZEUG-ANHÄNGERKOMBINATION UND BREMSEINRICHTUNG GESTEUERT NACH DEM VERFAHREN | [2016/46] | English: | METHOD TO CONTROL THE BRAKE SYSTEM OF A TRACTOR-TRAILER COMBINATION, AND BRAKE SYSTEM CONTROLLED ACCORDING TO THAT METHOD | [2020/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR CONTRÔLER LE SYSTÈME DE FREINAGE D'UNE COMBINAISON TRACTEUR-REMORQUE, ET SYSTÈME CONTROLÉ SELON CE PROCÉDÉ | [2020/03] |
Former [2016/46] | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A BRAKE MECHANISM IN A TRACTOR VEHICLE-TRAILER COMBINATION, AND BRAKE MECHANISM CONTROLLED ACCORDING TO SAID METHOD | ||
Former [2016/46] | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE FREINAGE D'UN ENSEMBLE TRACTEUR-REMORQUE ET DISPOSITIF DE FREINAGE COMMANDÉ SELON LE PROCÉDÉ | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/46] | 17.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/48] | 10.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2269880 (TIETJEN GMBH DIPL ING [DE]) [A] 1-30 * abstract * * claims 3,4 ** figures 2,3 *; | [XI]EP2384941 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,8,9,13,17,18,20,23-27 * the whole document * [I] 3,4,14-16,19,21,22,28-30 |