EP3062738 - POWERED TOOTHBRUSH HEAD HAVING A TUFT BLOCK WITH A COMBINATION OF OSCILLATING MOTIONS AND METHOD FOR OSCILLATING SAID TUFT BLOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/36] | POWERED TOOTHBRUSH HEAD HAVING A TUFT BLOCK WITH A COMBINATION OF OSCILLATING MOTIONS | ||
[2019/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [2016/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLOCH, Brian 11 O'Connor Drive Hillsborough, New Jersey 08844 / US | 02 /
LIEBERWIRTH, Lars Ralf Rainer Zum Talblick 18 61479 Glashuetten / DE | [2016/36] | Representative(s) | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/36] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14824698.6 | 17.12.2014 | [2016/36] | WO2014US70921 | Priority number, date | CN201310701288 | 19.12.2013 Original published format: CN201310701288 | [2016/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015095371 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3062738 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3062738 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61C17/34 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
A61C17/3472 (EP,CN,US);
A46B5/0095 (US);
A46B9/04 (US);
A61C17/34 (CN);
A61C17/3418 (EP,CN,US);
A61C17/3445 (US);
A61C17/3454 (US);
A61C17/3463 (EP,CN,US);
A61C17/349 (EP,US);
B08B1/12 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE ZAHNBÜRSTE MIT BORSTENBLOCK MIT EINER KOMBINATION AUS SCHWINGUNGSBEWEGUNGEN UND METHODE ZUR SCHWINGUNGSBEWEGUNG DIESES BORSTENBLOCKS | [2019/27] | English: | POWERED TOOTHBRUSH HEAD HAVING A TUFT BLOCK WITH A COMBINATION OF OSCILLATING MOTIONS AND METHOD FOR OSCILLATING SAID TUFT BLOCK | [2019/27] | French: | TÊTE DE BROSSE À DENT ÉLECTRIQUE COMPRENANT UN BLOC TOUFFE AVEC UNE COMBINAISON DE MOUVEMENTS OSCILLANTS ET MÉTHODE POUR FAIRE OSCILLER LEDIT BLOC TOUFFE | [2019/27] |
Former [2016/36] | ELEKTRISCHE ZAHNBÜRSTE MIT BORSTENBLOCK MIT EINER KOMBINATION AUS SCHWINGUNGSBEWEGUNGEN | ||
Former [2016/36] | POWERED TOOTHBRUSH HEAD HAVING A TUFT BLOCK WITH A COMBINATION OF OSCILLATING MOTIONS | ||
Former [2016/36] | TÊTE DE BROSSE À DENT ÉLECTRIQUE COMPRENANT UN BLOC TOUFFE AVEC UNE COMBINAISON DE MOUVEMENTS OSCILLANTS | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/36] | 17.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.12.2014 | AL | 05.02.2020 | AT | 05.02.2020 | CY | 05.02.2020 | CZ | 05.02.2020 | DK | 05.02.2020 | EE | 05.02.2020 | ES | 05.02.2020 | FI | 05.02.2020 | HR | 05.02.2020 | IT | 05.02.2020 | LT | 05.02.2020 | LV | 05.02.2020 | MC | 05.02.2020 | MK | 05.02.2020 | MT | 05.02.2020 | NL | 05.02.2020 | PL | 05.02.2020 | RO | 05.02.2020 | RS | 05.02.2020 | SE | 05.02.2020 | SI | 05.02.2020 | SK | 05.02.2020 | SM | 05.02.2020 | TR | 05.02.2020 | BG | 05.05.2020 | NO | 05.05.2020 | GR | 06.05.2020 | IS | 05.06.2020 | PT | 28.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 17.12.2014 | |
AL | 05.02.2020 | ||
AT | 05.02.2020 | ||
CY | 05.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
MT | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
TR | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 17.12.2014 | |
AT | 05.02.2020 | ||
CY | 05.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
MT | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
TR | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 05.02.2020 | |
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 05.02.2020 | |
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 05.02.2020 | |
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 05.02.2020 | |
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 05.02.2020 | |
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 05.02.2020 | |
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
NO | 05.05.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005005375 (BLAUSTEIN LAWRENCE A [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-20 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0037] * * figures 9A,10 *; | [X]KR100835151B (PROCTER&GAMBLE CO) [X] 1,2,6-10,12-14* the whole document *; | [XI]US2012137452 (DICKIE ROBERT G [CA]) [X] 1-5,7-9,11-16,19,20 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0042] * * figures 9-11,13 * [I] 10,17,18; | [X]US2013247312 (SORRENTINO ALAN [US]) [X] 1,2,6-10,12-14 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0031] * * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | US5625916 |