EP2946197 - IN-SITU SPECTROSCOPY FOR MONITORING FABRICATION OF INTEGRATED COMPUTATIONAL ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072 / US | [2015/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRICE, James M. 5 Gambrel Oak Lane The Woodlands, Texas 77380 / US | 02 /
NAYAK, Aditya B. 4855 Magnolia Cove Drive Apt. 110 Humble, Texas 77345 / US | 03 /
PERKINS, David L. 27 Bark Bend Place The Woodlands, Texas 77385 / US | [2015/48] | Representative(s) | Jennings, Michael John, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/48] | Jennings, Michael John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14824758.8 | 14.02.2014 | [2015/48] | WO2014US16603 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015122923 | Date: | 20.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2946197 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/41, G01B11/06, E21B49/00, B29D11/00, G01N21/84, G02B5/28, G01J3/28, G05B19/4099, G01N21/31 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
G01J3/28 (EP,US);
G05B19/4099 (US);
B29D11/0073 (EP,US);
B32B3/266 (EP,US);
G01J3/0264 (EP,US);
G01J3/0286 (EP,US);
G01J3/08 (EP,US);
G01J3/12 (EP,US);
G01J3/45 (EP,US);
G01N21/31 (EP,US);
G01N21/8422 (EP,US);
G02B5/285 (EP,US);
G02B5/287 (EP,US);
B32B2307/40 (EP,US);
B32B2307/418 (EP,US);
B32B2307/732 (EP,US);
B32B2551/00 (EP,US);
G01J2003/1226 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/48] | G01N21/41, G01B11/06, E21B49/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/48] | Title | German: | IN-SITU-SPEKTROSKOPIE ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER HERSTELLUNG VON INTEGRIERTEN RECHENELEMENTEN | [2015/48] | English: | IN-SITU SPECTROSCOPY FOR MONITORING FABRICATION OF INTEGRATED COMPUTATIONAL ELEMENTS | [2015/48] | French: | SPECTROSCOPIE IN-SITU DE SURVEILLANCE DE LA FABRICATION D'ÉLÉMENTS DE CALCUL INTÉGRÉS | [2015/48] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/48] | 17.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/51] | 31.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5657124 (ZHANG JINGWEI [FR], et al) [Y] 11-15,18 * abstract *; | [Y]US6215556 (ZHANG JINGWEI [FR], et al) [Y] 5,11-15,18 * figures 1, 6, 8, 11; claim 1 *; | [Y]JP2001110806 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 2-16,18-20 * abstract *; | [A]US6395563 (ERIGUCHI KOJI [JP]) [A] 1-20 * column 4, line 21 - line 25; figures 1, 2 * * column 9, line 8 - line 14 *; | [A]US2007070357 (AIYER ARUN A [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract *; | [Y]US2010291714 (HESSE RAIK [DE], et al) [Y] 3,8-10,19,20 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0080]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2012140235 (LEE CHENG-CHUNG [US], et al) [A] 1-20* page 2, column 1, line 25 - line 36; figures 1, 2 *; | [XY]US2013284895 (FREESE ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1,17 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039]; figure 1 * [Y] 2-16,18-20; | [XY] - SOYEMI O ET AL, "DESIGN AND TESTING OF A MULTIVARIATE OPTICAL ELEMENT: THE FIRST DEMONSTRATION OF MULTIVARIATE OPTICAL COMPUTING FOR PREDICTIVE SPECTROSOCPY", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20010315), vol. 73, no. 6, doi:10.1021/AC0012896, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 1069 - 1079, XP001063566 [X] 1,17 * page 1071, column 1, paragraph 1 - column 2, paragraph 2 * * abstract * [Y] 2-16,18-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac0012896 | [XY] - HAIBACH F G ET AL, "ON-LINE REOPTIMIZATION OF FILTER DESIGNS FOR MULTIVARIATE OPTICAL ELEMENTS", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (20030401), vol. 42, no. 10, doi:10.1364/AO.42.001833, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 1833 - 1838, XP001152469 [X] 1,17 * page 1835, column 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 4 * [Y] 2-16,18-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.42.001833 | [Y] - KALIMANOVA I ET AL, "Ellipsometry and thin films parameters measurement", ELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY: MEETING THE CHALLENGES OF ELECTRONICS TECHNOLO GY PROGRESS, 2005. 28TH INTERNATIONAL SPRING SEMINAR ON WIENER NEUSTADT, AUSTRIA MAY 19-20, 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050519), doi:10.1109/ISSE.2005.1491074, ISBN 978-0-7803-9325-7, pages 472 - 475, XP010824549 [Y] 2-4,6,7,16 * page 473, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 475, column 1, paragraph 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISSE.2005.1491074 | International search | [A]US7138156 (MYRICK MICHAEL L [US], et al) [A] 1-49 * See abstract, column 9, line 51- column 10, line 41, claims 20-23 and figures 5-10. *; | [A]US2010245096 (JONES CHRISTOPHER M [US], et al) [A] 1-49 * See abstract, paragraphs [0112]-[0117] and figures 1-5. *; | [A]US2013032338 (KALIA NITIKA [US], et al) [A] 1-49* See abstract, paragraphs [0040]-[0044], claims 1, 13 and figures 1, 2. *; | [A]US2013284894 (FREESE ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-49 * See abstract, paragraphs [0038]-[0052], [0068]-[0077], claims 1, 8 and figures 1-9B. *; | [A]US2013284900 (FREESE ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-49 * See abstract, paragraphs [0036]-[0042], [0087]-[0093] and figures 1-10. * |