EP3083055 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SAMPLE CONCENTRATION AND DETECTION USING A SEPARATION LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neogen Food Safety US HoldCo Corporation 620 Lesher Place Lansing, MI 48912 / US | [2024/26] |
Former [2016/43] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAJAGOPAL, Raj 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
HALVERSON, Kurt J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14825030.1 | 16.12.2014 | [2016/43] | WO2014US70523 | Priority number, date | US201361919001P | 20.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361919001 P | [2016/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015095145 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3083055 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
B01L3/50215 (EP,US);
B01L3/5021 (EP,US);
C12Q1/24 (US);
B01L2200/0605 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0631 (US);
B01L2200/0642 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0673 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0636 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0681 (US);
B01L2300/0832 (US);
B01L2300/0893 (EP,US);
B01L2300/161 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0409 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR PROBENKONZENTRATION UND -ERKENNUNG MITTELS FLÜSSIGKEITSTRENNUNG | [2016/43] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SAMPLE CONCENTRATION AND DETECTION USING A SEPARATION LIQUID | [2016/43] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LA CONCENTRATION ET LA DÉTECTION D'ÉCHANTILLON AU MOYEN D'UN LIQUIDE DE SÉPARATION | [2016/43] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 15.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.11.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 17.11.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.11.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3722562 (SZABADOS ANDREAS [DE]) [A] 20-22 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]WO8905456 (BIOTOPE INC [US]) [Y] 1-22 * pages 23-41; table 1 *; | [A]US2011164862 (HIRANO KIRK M [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * paragraphs [0192] , [0193] *; | [A]US2012048002 (MALLET CLAUDE R [US]) [A] 20-22 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012245038 (LINTON JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0079] ** paragraphs [0085] - [0101] *; | [YD]WO2013003308 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [YD] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO2013003309 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [X] 1,3-20 * page 34, line 19 - page 40, line 19 * * pages 23-25 * * figures 1-24 * [Y] 2,21,22 | by applicant | US4539256 | US4726989 | US4867881 | US5120594 | US5260360 | US6386699 | US6420622 | US2002128578 | US2003235677 | WO2004000569 | US6867342 | US7223364 | US2007134784 | WO2007070310 | WO2010071764 | WO2010078234 | WO2011063332 | WO2011152967 | WO2011153085 | WO2011156251 | WO2011156258 | US2013006191 | WO2013003308 |