EP3066329 - PROCESS OF TESTING AND ELECTRONIC CONTROL UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/37] | TECHNICAL TRIAL METHOD | ||
[2017/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safran Aircraft Engines 2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2018/28] |
Former [2016/37] | For all designated states Snecma 2 Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE GONIDEC, Serge 50 rue de Verdun F-27200 Vernon / FR | 02 /
REICHSTADT, Sébastien 5 rue Louis Vuitton F-92600 Asnieres Seine / FR | 03 /
MUSTA, Virgil 1 rue Adolphe Vard F-27200 Vernon / FR | [2016/37] | Representative(s) | Calvo de Nó, Rodrigo, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2016/37] | Application number, filing date | 14825377.6 | 24.10.2014 | [2016/37] | WO2014FR52713 | Priority number, date | FR20130060840 | 05.11.2013 Original published format: FR 1360840 | [2016/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015067872 | Date: | 14.05.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3066329 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3066329 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F02K9/00, F02C9/00, F02K9/96, G01M15/02, G01M15/14 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
F02K9/96 (EP,US);
F02C9/00 (EP,US);
F02K9/00 (EP,US);
G01M15/14 (EP,US);
F05D2260/83 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/37] | F02K9/00, F02C9/00, G01M15/02, G01M15/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TESTVERFAHREN UND ELEKTRONISCHE STEUERUNGSEINHEIT | [2017/26] | English: | PROCESS OF TESTING AND ELECTRONIC CONTROL UNIT | [2017/26] | French: | PROCEDE D'ESSAI TECHNIQUE ET UNITÉ ÉLECTRONIQUE DE COMMANDE | [2017/26] |
Former [2016/37] | VERFAHREN FÜR TECHNISCHE VERSUCHE | ||
Former [2016/37] | TECHNICAL TRIAL METHOD | ||
Former [2016/37] | PROCEDE D'ESSAI TECHNIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/37] | 13.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.10.2014 | AL | 18.10.2017 | AT | 18.10.2017 | CY | 18.10.2017 | CZ | 18.10.2017 | DK | 18.10.2017 | EE | 18.10.2017 | ES | 18.10.2017 | FI | 18.10.2017 | HR | 18.10.2017 | LT | 18.10.2017 | LV | 18.10.2017 | MC | 18.10.2017 | MK | 18.10.2017 | MT | 18.10.2017 | NL | 18.10.2017 | PL | 18.10.2017 | PT | 18.10.2017 | RO | 18.10.2017 | RS | 18.10.2017 | SE | 18.10.2017 | SI | 18.10.2017 | SK | 18.10.2017 | SM | 18.10.2017 | TR | 18.10.2017 | IE | 24.10.2017 | LU | 24.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | BG | 18.01.2018 | NO | 18.01.2018 | GR | 19.01.2018 | IS | 18.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 24.10.2014 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MK | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PT | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 24.10.2017 | ||
LU | 24.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 24.10.2014 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MK | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 24.10.2017 | ||
LU | 24.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 24.10.2014 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MK | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 24.10.2017 | ||
LU | 24.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 24.10.2014 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 24.10.2017 | ||
LU | 24.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 24.10.2014 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 24.10.2017 | ||
LU | 24.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 24.10.2017 | ||
LU | 24.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 24.10.2017 | ||
LU | 24.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 24.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 24.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 24.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 24.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 24.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 18.10.2017 | |
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 18.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2939170 (SNECMA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * page 26, line 11 - page 27, line 26; figure 6B; claim 1 *; | [A]FR2965915 (SNECMA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * page 11, line 27 - page 12, line 19 * * page 14, line 6 - page 20, line 5; claim 15 *; | [A]FR2966928 (SNECMA [FR]) [A] 1-10* the whole document * |