EP3022250 - METAL-ORGANIC MATERIALS AND METHOD FOR PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yeda Research and Development Co., Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | [2016/28] |
Former [2016/21] | For all designated states YEDA RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT CO. LTD., AT THE WEI P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DER BOOM, Milko E. 20 Darbella Street 7530255 Rishon LeZion / IL | 02 /
LAHAV, Michal c/o Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | 03 /
BALGLEY, Renata c/o Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | 04 /
SHANKAR POOPANAL, Sreejith c/o Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | [2016/21] | Representative(s) | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP The Gridiron Building One Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | [2021/34] |
Former [2016/21] | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP The Gridiron Building One Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14825682.9 | 13.07.2014 | [2016/21] | WO2014IL50635 | Priority number, date | US201361846021P | 14.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361846021 P | [2016/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015008280 | Date: | 22.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3022250 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3022250 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 22.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07F15/00, C07F1/08, C07F3/06, C07F19/00, C07D213/06, C07D213/53, B01J20/02, B01J20/22, C08G83/00, C08L101/00 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
C07D213/06 (EP,US);
B01D53/02 (US);
B01J20/02 (EP,US);
B01J20/226 (EP,US);
C07D213/53 (EP,US);
C07F1/08 (EP,US);
C07F15/0066 (EP,US);
C07F19/00 (EP,US);
C07F3/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/21] | C08G83/00, C07F19/00, B01J20/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METALLORGANISCHE MATERIALIEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2016/21] | English: | METAL-ORGANIC MATERIALS AND METHOD FOR PREPARATION | [2016/21] | French: | MATÉRIAUX ORGANOMÉTALLIQUES ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2016/21] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/21] | 16.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.07.2014 | AL | 25.08.2021 | AT | 25.08.2021 | CY | 25.08.2021 | CZ | 25.08.2021 | DK | 25.08.2021 | EE | 25.08.2021 | ES | 25.08.2021 | FI | 25.08.2021 | HR | 25.08.2021 | LT | 25.08.2021 | LV | 25.08.2021 | MC | 25.08.2021 | MK | 25.08.2021 | MT | 25.08.2021 | NL | 25.08.2021 | PL | 25.08.2021 | RO | 25.08.2021 | RS | 25.08.2021 | SE | 25.08.2021 | SI | 25.08.2021 | SK | 25.08.2021 | SM | 25.08.2021 | BG | 25.11.2021 | NO | 25.11.2021 | GR | 26.11.2021 | IS | 25.12.2021 | PT | 27.12.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 13.07.2014 | |
AL | 25.08.2021 | ||
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
MK | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 13.07.2014 | |
AL | 25.08.2021 | ||
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 13.07.2014 | |
AL | 25.08.2021 | ||
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2013058844 (UNIV NORTHWESTERN [US], et al) [I] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X] - REVITAL KAMINKER ET AL, "Coordination-Polymer Nanotubes and Spheres: A Ligand-Structure Effect", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, DE, (20110304), vol. 50, no. 14, doi:10.1002/anie.201008193, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 3224 - 3226, XP055308217 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201008193 | International search | [X] - KAMINKER R. ET AL., "Coordination-Polymer Nanotubes and Spheres: A Ligand-Structure Effect", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE , INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (2011), vol. 50, no. 14, pages 3224 - 3226, XP055308217 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201008193 | [X] - SHANKAR ET AL., "Homogeneously Micro-structured Metal-Organic Coordination Polymers'.", 4TH NATIONAL GRADUATE STUDENT, SYMPOSIUM IN ORGANIC CHEMISTRY., (20120910), XP008182333 | [X] - SCHILLING,C.I ET AL., "Fourfold Suzuki-Miyaura and Sonogashira Cross-Coupling Reactions on Tetrahedral Methane and Adamantane Derivatives", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2011), pages 1743 - 1754, XP055308210 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ejoc.201001567 | [A] - MOQING HU., "Design, synthesis and applications of Metal Organic Frameworks'.", A THESIS, DEPARTMENT OF CHEMISTRY AND BIOCHEMISTRY, (20110902), XP055308199 | by applicant | - SPOKOYNY, A.M.KIM, D.SUMREIN, A.MIRKIN, C.A., Chem. Soc. Rev., (20090000), vol. 38, pages 1218 - 1227 | - ADISA, O.O.COX, B.J.HILL, J.M., Nanoscale, (20120000), vol. 4, pages 3295 - 3307 | - BAILAR, J.C., Jr Prep. Inorg. React., (19640000), vol. 1, pages 1 - 57 | - BAN, Y.LI, Y.LIU, X.PENG, Y.YANG, W., Microporous and Mesoporous Materials, (20130000), vol. 173, pages 29 - 36 | - BATTEN, S.R., CrystEnggComm, (20010000), vol. 18, pages 1 - 7 | - BIRADHA, K.RAMANAN, A.VITTAL, J.J., Crystal Growth and Design, (20090000), vol. 9, pages 2969 - 2970 | - BRIDGEMAN, A.J., Dalton Trans., (20080000), pages 1989 - 1992 | - CARNE-SANCHEZ, A.IMAZ, I.STYLIANOU, K.C.MASPOCH, D., Chem. Eur. J., (20140000), vol. 20, pages 5192 - 5201 | - CHEN, B.XIANG, S.QIAN, G., Acc. Chem. Res., (20100000), vol. 43, pages 1115 - 1124 | - CHO, W.LEE, H.JOH, M., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20080000), vol. 130, pages 16943 - 16946 | - KAMINKER, R.MOTIEI, L.GULINO, A.FRAGAL, I.SHIMON, L.J.W.EVMENENKO, G.DUTTA, P.IRON, M.A.VAN DER BOOM, M.E., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20100000), vol. 132, page 14554 | - COOK, T.R.YANG, R.Y.STANG, P.J., Chem. Rev., (20130000), vol. 113, pages 734 - 777 | - EVANS, O.R.LIN, W., Acc. Chem. Res., (20020000), vol. 35, page 511 | - NOORDUIN, W.GRINTHAL, A.MAHADEVAN, L.AIZENBERG, J., Science, (20130000), vol. 340, pages 1230444 - 837 | - GAO, J.YE, K.YANG, L.XIONG, W.W.YE, L.WANG, Y.ZHANG, Q., Inorg. Chem., (20140000), vol. 53, pages 691 - 693 | - GU, X.W.LOYNACHAN, C.N.WU, Z.ZHANG, Y.W.SROLOVITZ, D.J.GREER, J.R., Nano Lett., (20120000), vol. 12, pages 6385 - 6392 | - GUO, Y.N.LI, Y.ZHI, B.ZHANG, D.LIUA, Y.HUO, Q., RSC Adv., (20120000), vol. 2, pages 5424 - 5429 | - HASENKNOPF, B.LEHN, J.M.BAUM, G.FENSKE, D., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19960000), vol. 93, pages 1397 - 1400 | - JEON, Y.M.ARMATAS, G.S.KIM, D.KANATZIDIS, M.G.MIRKIN, C.A., Small, (20090000), vol. 5, pages 46 - 50 | - JUNG, S.OH, M., Angew. Chem., Int. Ed., (20080000), vol. 47, pages 2049 - 2051 | - KAMINKER, R.POPOVITZ-BIRO, R.VAN DER BOOM, M.E., Angew. Chem, Int. Ed., (20110000), vol. 50, pages 3224 - 3226 | - KITAGAWA, S.KITAURA, R.NORO, S., Angew. Chem., Int. Ed., (20040000), vol. 43, page 2334 | - KONDO, M.OKUBO, T.ASAMI, A.NORO, S.-I.YOSHITOMI, T.KITAGAWA, S.ISHII, T.MATSUZAKA, H.SEKI, K., Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (19990000), vol. 38, pages 140 - 143 | - LEI, B.F.LI, B.ZHANG, H.R.ZHANG, L.M.LI, W.L., J. Phys. Chem. C, (20070000), vol. 111, page 11291 | - LI, W.DOBLINGER, M.VANESKI, A.ROGACH, A.L.JACKEL, F.FELDMANN, J., J. Mat. Chem., (20110000), vol. 21, pages 17946 - 17952 | - LIU, K.YOU, H.JIA, G.ZHENG, Y.HUANG, Y.SONG, Y.YANG, M.ZHANG, L.ZHANG, H., Crystal Growth and Design, (20100000), vol. 10, pages 790 - 797 | - LU, Y.CAO, H.ZHANG, S.ZHANG, X., J. Mater. Chem., (20110000), vol. 21, pages 8633 - 8639 | - LU, W.WEI, Z.GU, Z.Y.LIU, T.F.PARK, J.PARK, J.TIAN, J.ZHANG, M.ZHANG, Q.GENTLE III, T., Chem. Soc. Rev., (20130000), vol. 42, pages 1728 - 1754 | - MANSON, J.A.VEENSTRA, M.LONG, J.R., Chem. Sci., (20140000), vol. 5, pages 32 - 51 | - MASOOMI, M.Y.MORSALI, A., RSCAdv., (20130000), vol. 3, pages 19191 - 19218 | - MURRAY, C.B.SUN, S.DASCHLER, W.DOYLE, H.BETLEY, T.A.KAGEN, C.R., Ibm. J. Res. & Dev., (20010000), vol. 45, pages 47 - 56 | - RIETER, W.J.TAYLOR, K.M.L.AN, H.LIN, W.LIN, W., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20060000), vol. 128, pages 12394 - 12395 | - OH, M.MIRKIN, C.A., Nature, (20050000), vol. 438, pages 651 - 654 | - OH, M.MIRKIN, C.A., Angew. Chem., Int. Ed., (20060000), vol. 45, pages 5492 - 5494 | - PEVZNER, A.ENGEL, Y.ELNATHAN, R.TSUKERNIK, A.BARKAY, Z.PATOLSKY, F., Nana Lett., (20120000), vol. 12, pages 7 - 12 | - RANFT, A.BETZLER, S.B.HAASE, F.LOTSCH, B.V., CrystEngComm, (20130000), vol. 15, pages 9296 - 9300 | - ROBERTS, R.J.ROWE, R.C.YORK, P., Powder Technology, (19910000), vol. 65, pages 139 - 146 | - ROWSELL, J.LC.YAGHI, O.M., Angew. Chem., Int. Ed., (20050000), vol. 44, page 4670 | - SADER, J.E.CHON, J.W.M.MULVANEY, P., Rev. Sci. Instrum., (19990000), vol. 70, page 3967 | - SCHILLING, C.I.PLIETZSCH, O.NIEGER, M.MULLER, T.BRASE, S., Eur. J. Org. Chem., (20110000), pages 1743 - 1754 | - SEO, J.S.WHANG, D.LEE, H.JUN, S.I.OH, J.JEON, Y.J.KIM, K., Nature, (20000000), vol. 404, page 982 | - SHI, N.XIE, L.SUN, H.DUAN, J.YIN, G.XUB, Z.HUANG, W., Chem. Commun., (20110000), vol. 47, pages 5055 - 5057 | - SHIRMAN, T.LAMERE, J.F.SHIMON, L.J.W.GUPTA, T.MARTIN, J.M.L.VAN DER BOOM, M.E., Cryst. Growth Des., (20080000), vol. 8, pages 3066 - 3072 | - SINDORO, M.YANAI, N.JEE, A.Y.GRANICK, S., Acc. Chem. Res., (20140000), vol. 47, pages 459 - 469 | - STOCK, N.BISWAS, S., Chem. Rev., (20110000), vol. 112, pages 933 - 969 | - SUN, X.DONG, S.WANG, E., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20050000), vol. 127, pages 13102 - 13103 | - TABELLION, F.M.SEIDEL, S.R.ARIF, A M.STANG, P.J., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20010000), vol. 123, page 7740 | - TABOR, D., J. Coll. Int. Sci., (19770000), vol. 58, pages 2 - 13 | - TAO, A.R.HABAS, S.YANG, P., Small, (20080000), vol. 4, pages 310 - 325 | - THOMPSON, A.M.W.C.HOCK, JMCCLEVERTY, J.A.WARD, M.D., Inorg. Chim. Acta., (19970000), vol. 256, pages 331 - 334 | - ZHAO, X.Y.LIANG, D.D.LIU, S.X.SUN, C.Y.CAO, R.G.GAO, C.Y.REN, Y.H.SU, Z.M., Inorg. Chem., (20080000), vol. 47, page 7133 | - TUXEN, A.CARENCO, S.CHINTAPALLI, M.CHUANG, C.H.ESCUDERO, C.PACH, E.JIANG, P.BORONDICS, F.BEBERWYCK, B.ALIVISATOS, A.P., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20130000), vol. 135, pages 13222 - 13234 | - WANG, H.ZENG, Y.MA, J.S.FU, H.YAO, J.MIKHALEVA, A.I.TROFIMOV, B.A., Chem. Commun., (20090000), pages 5457 - 5459 | - WEI, H.LI, B.DU, Y.DONG, S.WANG, E., Chem. Mater., (20070000), vol. 19, pages 2987 - 2993 | - WHITESIDES, G.M.GRZYBOWSKI, B., Science, (20020000), vol. 295, pages 2418 - 2421 | - YAGHI, O.M.OBKEEFFE, M.OCKWIG, N.W.CHAE, H.K.EDDAOUDI, M.KIM, J., Nature, (20030000), vol. 423, page 705 | - ZHANG, W.JIN, W.FUKUSHIMA, T.ISHII, N.AIDA, T., Angew. Chem, Int. Ed., (20090000), vol. 48, pages 4747 - 4750 | - ZHAO, X.XIAO, B.FLETCHER, A.J.THOMAS, K.M.BRADSHAW, D.ROSSEINSKY, M.J., Science, (20040000), vol. 306, page 1012 | - ZHAO, D.TIMMONS, D.J.YUAN, D.ZHOU, H.C., Acc. Chem. Res., (20110000), vol. 44, pages 123 - 133 |