EP3023249 - ANTI-FOG ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2016/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGIHARA Yosuke c/o ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LIMITED 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 02 /
KODAIRA Hirokazu c/o ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LIMITED 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 03 /
MORI Yusuke c/o ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LIMITED 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 04 /
YONEDA Takashige c/o ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LIMITED 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2016/21] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2016/21] | Application number, filing date | 14826096.1 | 09.07.2014 | [2016/21] | WO2014JP68263 | Priority number, date | JP20130148526 | 17.07.2013 Original published format: JP 2013148526 | [2016/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015008672 | Date: | 22.01.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3023249 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/38, B32B27/18, C03C17/28, B32B27/26, C03C17/32, C09D163/00, C09D5/00, C09D7/12 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
C09D7/45 (EP,US);
C03C17/326 (EP,US);
C09D163/00 (US);
C09D5/00 (US);
C03C2217/75 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/21] | B32B27/38, B32B27/18, C03C17/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] | Title | German: | ANTI-NEBEL-ARTIKEL | [2016/21] | English: | ANTI-FOG ARTICLE | [2016/21] | French: | ARTICLE ANTIBUÉE | [2016/21] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2016 | Translation filed | 28.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/21] | 22.08.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP1862514 (SDC TECHNOLOGIES ASIA LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * paragraphs [0030] - [0034] - [0 53] , [0 58]; example -; claims 3-5 * [Y] 2,3[I] 4,8; | [IY]WO2012077686 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [I] 1,5-7 * paragraphs [0138] , [ 270]; claims 1,4,6,7,11 * [Y] 2,3 | International search | [A]JPS57119973 (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK); | [A]JP2008273067 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [A]JP2008273746 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD); | [A]WO2009151086 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2011004873 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2012077686 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2013089165 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | WO2007052710 |