EP3023292 - LIFTER MECHANISM WITH A CUSHION FRAME UNIT AND VEHICLE SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/21] | LIFTER MECHANISM AND VEHICULAR SEAT | ||
[2020/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delta Tooling Co., Ltd. 1-2-10, Yanoshinmachi Akiku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 736-0084 / JP | [2016/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJITA, Etsunori c/o Delta Tooling Co. Ltd. 1-2-10 Yanoshinmachi Akiku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 736-0084 / JP | 02 /
OGURA, Yumi c/o Delta Tooling Co. Ltd. 1-2-10 Yanoshinmachi Akiku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 736-0084 / JP | 03 /
KAWASAKI, Seiji c/o Delta Tooling Co. Ltd. 1-2-10 Yanoshinmachi Akiku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 736-0084 / JP | 04 /
INOUE, Katsuhiro c/o Delta Tooling Co. Ltd. 1-2-10 Yanoshinmachi Akiku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 736-0084 / JP | 05 /
SUGIMOTO, Eiji c/o Delta Kogyo Co. Ltd. 1-14 Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 735-8501 / JP | 06 /
NAKAMURA, Minoru c/o Delta Kogyo Co. Ltd. 1-14 Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 735-8501 / JP | 07 /
KUWANO, Ryuji c/o Delta Kogyo Co. Ltd. 1-14 Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 735-8501 / JP | 08 /
NISHIDA, Atsushi c/o Delta Kogyo Co. Ltd. 1-14 Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 735-8501 / JP | [2020/34] |
Former [2016/21] | 01 /
FUJITA Etsunori c/o Delta Tooling Co. Ltd. 1-2-10 Yanoshinmachi Akiku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 736-0084 / JP | ||
02 /
OGURA Yumi c/o Delta Tooling Co. Ltd. 1-2-10 Yanoshinmachi Akiku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 736-0084 / JP | |||
03 /
KAWASAKI Seiji c/o Delta Tooling Co. Ltd. 1-2-10 Yanoshinmachi Akiku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 736-0084 / JP | |||
04 /
INOUE Katsuhiro c/o Delta Tooling Co. Ltd. 1-2-10 Yanoshinmachi Akiku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 736-0084 / JP | |||
05 /
SUGIMOTO Eiji c/o Delta Kogyo Co. Ltd. 1-14 Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 735-8501 / JP | |||
06 /
NAKAMURA Minoru c/o Delta Kogyo Co. Ltd. 1-14 Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 735-8501 / JP | |||
07 /
KUWANO Ryuji c/o Delta Kogyo Co. Ltd. 1-14 Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 735-8501 / JP | |||
08 /
NISHIDA Atsushi c/o Delta Kogyo Co. Ltd. 1-14 Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 735-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/21] | Application number, filing date | 14826769.3 | 11.07.2014 | [2016/21] | WO2014JP68639 | Priority number, date | JP20130147144 | 14.07.2013 Original published format: JP 2013147144 | JP20130253711 | 07.12.2013 Original published format: JP 2013253711 | [2016/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015008713 | Date: | 22.01.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3023292 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3023292 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/16, B60N2/06, B60N2/427, B60N2/68, B60N2/42 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
B60N2/06 (EP,US);
B60N2/501 (US);
B60N2/1615 (EP,US);
B60N2/165 (EP,US);
B60N2/166 (US);
B60N2/4228 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/10] | B60N2/16, B60N2/06, B60N2/42, B60R21/02, B60N2/50, B60N2/427 | ||
Former IPC [2016/21] | B60N2/16, B60N2/06, B60N2/42, B60R21/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEBEMECHANISMUS MIT SITZRAHMEN UND FAHRZEUGSITZ | [2020/09] | English: | LIFTER MECHANISM WITH A CUSHION FRAME UNIT AND VEHICLE SEAT | [2020/09] | French: | MÉCANISME ÉLÉVATEUR AVEC STRUCTURE DE SIÈGE ET SIÈGE POUR VÉHICULE | [2020/09] |
Former [2016/21] | HEBEMECHANISMUS UND FAHRZEUGSITZ | ||
Former [2016/21] | LIFTER MECHANISM AND VEHICULAR SEAT | ||
Former [2016/21] | MÉCANISME ÉLÉVATEUR ET SIÈGE POUR VÉHICULE | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2016 | Translation filed | 22.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 22.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/21] | 31.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.07.2014 | AL | 19.08.2020 | AT | 19.08.2020 | CY | 19.08.2020 | CZ | 19.08.2020 | DK | 19.08.2020 | EE | 19.08.2020 | ES | 19.08.2020 | FI | 19.08.2020 | HR | 19.08.2020 | LT | 19.08.2020 | LV | 19.08.2020 | MC | 19.08.2020 | MK | 19.08.2020 | MT | 19.08.2020 | NL | 19.08.2020 | PL | 19.08.2020 | RO | 19.08.2020 | RS | 19.08.2020 | SE | 19.08.2020 | SI | 19.08.2020 | SK | 19.08.2020 | SM | 19.08.2020 | TR | 19.08.2020 | BG | 19.11.2020 | NO | 19.11.2020 | GR | 20.11.2020 | IS | 19.12.2020 | PT | 21.12.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 11.07.2014 | |
AL | 19.08.2020 | ||
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CY | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
MK | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
TR | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 11.07.2014 | |
AL | 19.08.2020 | ||
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CY | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
MK | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 11.07.2014 | |
AL | 19.08.2020 | ||
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CY | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 11.07.2014 | |
AL | 19.08.2020 | ||
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 19.08.2020 | |
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 19.08.2020 | |
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 19.08.2020 | |
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP1366950 (FUJI KIKO KK [JP]) [X] 1,4,6 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0028] * [Y] 5,7-10 [I] 2,3; | [Y]EP1782713 (DELTA TOOLING CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 7-10 * abstract ** paragraphs [0003] , [0 13] , [0 23] , [0 24] , [0 29] , [0 31] , [0 32] , [0 33] , [0 34] , [0 38] , [0 44] , [0 45] , [0 46] *; | [Y]EP2468566 (DELTA TOOLING CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] , [0 39] , [0 40] * | International search | [A]JPS60164439U (FUJI KIKO CO., LTD.); | [A]JPH10100757 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP, et al); | [A]JPH1199857 (TACHI S CO) | by applicant | JPS60164439U |