EP3023782 - SAMPLE ANALYSIS DEVICE AND GRADIENT LIQUID FEED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sekisui Medical Co., Ltd. 13-5, Nihonbashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | [2016/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOTANI, Takuya c/o SEKISUI MEDICAL CO. LTD. 13-5 Nihonbashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | 02 /
TAIRA, Hiroaki c/o SEKISUI MEDICAL CO. LTD. 13-5 Nihonbashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | 03 /
OKA, Takayuki c/o SEKISUI MEDICAL CO. LTD. 13-5 Nihonbashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | 04 /
MURAKI, Hideki 2-14-13 Kamidaira Fussa-shi Tokyo 197-0012 / JP | [2016/21] | Representative(s) | Bohmann, Armin K. Bohmann Anwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Straße 1 80335 München / DE | [2016/21] | Application number, filing date | 14826856.8 | 17.07.2014 | [2016/21] | WO2014JP69106 | Priority number, date | JP20130148369 | 17.07.2013 Original published format: JP 2013148369 | [2016/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015008845 | Date: | 22.01.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3023782 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3023782 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/34, G01N30/26, G01N30/32, // G01N30/88 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
G01N30/34 (EP,US);
G01N30/16 (US);
G01N30/88 (EP,US);
G01N33/491 (EP,US);
G01N2030/027 (US);
G01N2030/347 (US);
G01N2030/8822 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/21] | G01N30/34, G01N30/26, G01N30/32, G01N30/88 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROBENANALYSEVORRICHTUNG UND GRADIENTENFLÜSSIGKEITSZUFUHRVORRICHTUNG | [2016/21] | English: | SAMPLE ANALYSIS DEVICE AND GRADIENT LIQUID FEED DEVICE | [2016/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE D'ÉCHANTILLON ET DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION DE LIQUIDE PAR GRADIENT | [2016/21] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2016 | Translation filed | 15.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/21] | 08.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 18.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 18.10.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 18.10.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.11.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.07.2014 | AL | 30.05.2018 | AT | 30.05.2018 | CY | 30.05.2018 | CZ | 30.05.2018 | DK | 30.05.2018 | EE | 30.05.2018 | ES | 30.05.2018 | HR | 30.05.2018 | LT | 30.05.2018 | LV | 30.05.2018 | MC | 30.05.2018 | MK | 30.05.2018 | NL | 30.05.2018 | PL | 30.05.2018 | PT | 30.05.2018 | RO | 30.05.2018 | RS | 30.05.2018 | SI | 30.05.2018 | SK | 30.05.2018 | SM | 30.05.2018 | TR | 30.05.2018 | IE | 17.07.2018 | LU | 17.07.2018 | MT | 17.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | BG | 30.08.2018 | GR | 31.08.2018 | IS | 30.09.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 17.07.2014 | |
AL | 30.05.2018 | ||
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
MK | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
MT | 17.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 17.07.2014 | |
AL | 30.05.2018 | ||
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
MT | 17.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
MT | 17.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
MT | 17.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
MT | 17.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 30.05.2018 | |
LT | 30.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US5450743 (BUOTE WILLIAM J [US]) [X] 1,5 * column 5, lines 4-35; figure 1 * * column 5, lines 56-61 * * column 2, lines 6-19 * [A] 3 [Y] 6 [I] 2,4; | [A]US6012487 (HAUCK BRIAN A [US]) [A] 1,3 * column 1, lines 9-15; figures 3A-3C,6D,6E; claim 1 * * column 7, lines 50-61; claims 10,13 * * column 1, lines 9-15 *; | [A]JP2001074755 (ARKRAY INC) [A] 1,3,5,6* figures 1,2; claim 4 *; | [YA]EP2345896 (ARKRAY INC [JP], et al) [Y] 6 * figure 1; claims 1,6 * [A] 1,3,5 | International search | [Y]JPS5658454U (SHIMADZU CORP.); | [Y]JPH0460456 (TOSOH CORP); | [Y]JP2003107069 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]JP2003107065 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [Y]JP2006509214 (WATERS INVESTMENTS LTD.); | [A]JP2011226914 (TOSOH CORP) | by applicant | JPH09264888 | JP2002303613 | WO2014JP61256 |