EP3022348 - METHOD OF FORMING A CONTINUOUS FILAMENT SPUN-LAID WEB AND A CONTINUOUS FILAMENT SPUN-LAID WEB FORMED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/21] | SPUN-LAID WEBS WITH AT LEAST ONE OF LOFTY, ELASTIC AND HIGH STRENGTH CHARACTERISTICS | ||
[2021/19] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILLS, INC. 7785 Ellis Road W.Melbourne, FL 32904 / US | [2016/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILKIE, Arnold 7785 Ellis Road West Melboune, FL 32904 / US | 02 /
BRANG, James 7785 Ellis Road West Melborne, FL 32904 / US | 03 /
HAGGARD, Jeffrey 7785 Ellis Road West Melbourne, FL 32904 / US | 04 /
DE LA HOZ, Angel Antonio 7785 Ellis Road West Melbourne, FL 32904 / US | [2016/21] | Representative(s) | Verscht, Thomas Kurt Albert Josephsburgstrasse 88 A 81673 München / DE | [2016/21] | Application number, filing date | 14826879.0 | 15.07.2014 | [2016/21] | WO2014US46669 | Priority number, date | US201361846152P | 15.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361846152 P | US201461986465P | 30.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461986465 P | [2016/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015009707 | Date: | 22.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3022348 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3022348 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | D04H3/00, D04H3/018, D04H3/08, D01D5/098, D01F8/06, D01F8/14 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
D01F8/14 (EP,US);
D01D5/098 (EP,US);
D01F8/06 (EP,US);
D04H3/018 (EP,US);
D04H3/08 (EP,US);
Y10T442/601 (EP,US);
Y10T442/612 (EP,US);
Y10T442/638 (EP,US);
Y10T442/64 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/21] | D04H3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ENDLOSFILAMENT-SPINNVLIESBAHN UND EINER DARAUS GEBILDETEN ENDLOSFILAMENT-SPINNVLIESBAHN | [2021/19] | English: | METHOD OF FORMING A CONTINUOUS FILAMENT SPUN-LAID WEB AND A CONTINUOUS FILAMENT SPUN-LAID WEB FORMED THEREFROM | [2021/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UNE NAPPE FILÉE EN FILAMENT CONTINU ET NAPPE FILÉE EN FILAMENT CONTINU FORMÉE À PARTIR DE CELLE-CI | [2021/19] |
Former [2016/21] | LEICHTE, ELASTISCHE UND/ODER HOCHFESTE SPUN-LAID-BAHNEN | ||
Former [2016/21] | SPUN-LAID WEBS WITH AT LEAST ONE OF LOFTY, ELASTIC AND HIGH STRENGTH CHARACTERISTICS | ||
Former [2016/21] | BANDES FILÉES-NON TISSÉE AVEC AU MOINS UNE PARMI DES PROPRIÉTÉS GONFLANTES, ÉLASTIQUES ET DE HAUTE TÉNACITÉ | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/21] | 12.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005098256 (POLANCO BRAULIO A [US], et al); | [XI]US2010310845 (BOND ERIC BRYAN [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2008132862 (COLLIAS DIMITRIS IOANNIS [US], et al); | [A]US2010124864 (DHARMARAJAN RAJA N [US], et al); | [X]US2010310845 (BOND ERIC BRYAN [US], et al) | Examination | US3595731 | by applicant | US6183684 | US7179412 |