EP3090059 - LUNG CANCER DETERMINATIONS USING MIRNA RATIOS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sozzi, Gabriella Via Vivaio 4 20122 Milan / IT | For all designated states Boeri, Mattia Via Banfi 3 20122 Milan / IT | For all designated states Pastorino, Ugo Via S. Francesco d'Assisi 15 20123 Milan / IT | [2019/15] |
Former [2017/36] | For all designated states Biomirna Holdings Ltd. 24 Farney Park Sandymount Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2016/45] | For all designated states Biomirna Holdings Ltd. 24 Farney park Sandymount Dublin 4 / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/15] |
Former [2017/17] | 01 /
SOZZI, Gabriella Via Vivaio 4 I-20122 Milan / IT | ||
02 /
BOERI, Mattia Via Banfi 3 I-20122 Milan / IT | |||
03 /
PASTORINO, Ugo Via S. Francesco d'Assisi 15 I-20123 Milan / IT | |||
Former [2016/45] | 01 /
SOZZI, Gabriella Via Banfi I-20122 Milan / IT | ||
02 /
BOERI, Mattia Via Banfi I-20122 Milan / IT | |||
03 /
PASTORINO, Ugo Via S. Francesco d'Assisi 15 I-20123 Milan / IT | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/45] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 14827245.3 | 31.12.2014 | [2016/45] | WO2014EP79499 | Priority number, date | US201461923758P | 05.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461923758 P | US201461926323P | 12.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461926323 P | [2016/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015101653 | Date: | 09.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3090059 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3090059 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,IL,US);
C12Q1/6813 (IL);
C12Q2600/118 (EP,IL,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,IL,US);
C12Q2600/16 (EP,IL,US);
C12Q2600/166 (EP,IL,US);
C12Q2600/178 (EP,IL,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MICRO-RNA QUOTIENTEN ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON LUNGENKREBS | [2017/29] | English: | LUNG CANCER DETERMINATIONS USING MIRNA RATIOS | [2016/45] | French: | DIAGNOSTIC DU CANCER DU POUMON EN UTILISANT LE RAPPORT MIARN | [2017/29] |
Former [2016/45] | LUNGENKREBSBESTIMMUNGEN MITTELS MIRNA-VERHÄLTNISSEN | ||
Former [2016/45] | DÉTERMINATIONS DE CANCER DU POUMON AU MOYEN DE RAPPORTS DE MIARN | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/45] | 22.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2017 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 09.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18175641.2 / EP3425066 | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20] | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 07.04.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 07.04.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.04.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.12.2014 | AL | 06.06.2018 | AT | 06.06.2018 | CY | 06.06.2018 | CZ | 06.06.2018 | DK | 06.06.2018 | EE | 06.06.2018 | FI | 06.06.2018 | HR | 06.06.2018 | LT | 06.06.2018 | LV | 06.06.2018 | MC | 06.06.2018 | MK | 06.06.2018 | NL | 06.06.2018 | PL | 06.06.2018 | PT | 06.06.2018 | RO | 06.06.2018 | RS | 06.06.2018 | SE | 06.06.2018 | SI | 06.06.2018 | SK | 06.06.2018 | SM | 06.06.2018 | TR | 06.06.2018 | BG | 06.09.2018 | NO | 06.09.2018 | GR | 07.09.2018 | IS | 06.10.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | LU | 31.12.2018 | MT | 31.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PT | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
LU | 31.12.2018 | ||
MT | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PT | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
LU | 31.12.2018 | ||
MT | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
LU | 31.12.2018 | ||
MT | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
LU | 31.12.2018 | ||
MT | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
LU | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
LU | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
LU | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 06.06.2018 | |
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2009070653 (UNIV OHIO STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) [A] 1-43 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2011053257 (AGENCY SCIENCE TECH & RES [SG], et al) [A] 1-43 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2012107841 (BIOMIRNA HOLDINGS LTD [IE], et al) [I] 1-43 * the whole document *; | [Y] - M. BOERI ET AL, "MicroRNA signatures in tissues and plasma predict development and prognosis of computed tomography detected lung cancer", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20110301), vol. 108, no. 9, doi:10.1073/pnas.1100048108, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 3713 - 3718, XP055044109 [Y] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1100048108 | [Y] - QIAN S ET AL, "MicroRNA expression profile of bronchioalveolar stem cells from mouse lung", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, vol. 377, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.BBRC.2008.10.052, ISSN 0006-291X, (20081212), pages 668 - 673, (20081021), XP025646136 [Y] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2008.10.052 | [A] - BOERI M ET AL, "Role of MicroRNAs in lung cancer: MicroRNA signatures in cancer prognosis", CANCER JOURNAL (UNITED STATES) 2012 LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS AND WILKINS USA, (201205), vol. 18, no. 3, ISSN 1528-9117, pages 268 - 274, XP008175873 [A] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/PPO.0b013e318258b743 | [A] - JI QI ET AL, "MicroRNAs and lung cancers: from pathogenesis to clinical implications", FRONTIERS OF MEDICINE, SP HIGHER EDUCATION PRESS, HEIDELBERG, (20120418), vol. 6, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S11684-012-0188-4, ISSN 2095-0225, pages 134 - 155, XP035065369 [A] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11684-012-0188-4 |