EP3022596 - CONNECTOR FOR TELECOMMUNICATION ENCLOSURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Research & Development Corporation One Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | [2018/32] |
Former [2016/21] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIMENTEL, Nelson Goncalves Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 D-41453 Neuss / DE | 02 /
BUND, Christine B. Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 D-41453 Neuss / DE | 03 /
HAJOK, Johann G. Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 D-41453 Neuss / DE | [2016/21] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/21] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14827885.6 | 30.06.2014 | [2016/21] | WO2014US44844 | Priority number, date | US201361846816P | 16.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361846816 P | [2016/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015047508 | Date: | 02.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3022596 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38, G02B6/44, H01R13/627 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
G02B6/3893 (EP,US);
G02B6/3825 (EP,US);
G02B6/38875 (EP,US);
G02B6/3888 (EP,US);
G02B6/3897 (EP,US);
G02B6/4471 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] | Title | German: | STECKVERBINDER FÜR DIE TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSGEHÄUSE | [2016/21] | English: | CONNECTOR FOR TELECOMMUNICATION ENCLOSURES | [2016/21] | French: | CONNECTEUR POUR COFFRETS DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATIONS | [2016/21] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/21] | 01.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008175541 (LU YU [US], et al); | [XI]WO2009076536 (ADC TELECOMMUNICATIONS INC [US], et al); | [XI]WO2012041840 (HUBER+SUHNER AG [CH], et al); | [XI]US2012257859 (NHEP PONHARITH [US]) | by applicant | US6487344 | US6579014 | US6648520 | US7090406 | US2011044588 | US8313250 | WO2013106183 |