EP3024668 - METHODS FOR IMPROVING SECUREMENT OF LABELS TO CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pepsico, Inc. 700 Anderson Hill Road Purchase, NY 10577 / US | [2016/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEVENSON, James A. c/o Pak Edge Solutions 102 Bevington Road Pittsburg, Pennsylvania 15221 / US | 02 /
WHITE, Charles c/o PepsiCo Inc. 700 Anderson Hill Road Purchase, New York 10577 / US | [2016/22] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/22] | Duxbury, Stephen Arnold & Siedsma Bavariaring 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14829272.5 | 22.07.2014 | [2016/22] | WO2014US47660 | Priority number, date | US201361856942P | 22.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361856942 P | [2016/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015013305 | Date: | 29.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3024668 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B44C1/17 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
G09F3/02 (EP,US);
B42D25/20 (RU);
B65D23/14 (US);
G09F3/10 (US);
G09F2003/0251 (EP,US);
G09F2003/0257 (US);
G09F2003/0272 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERTEN SICHERUNG VON ETIKETTEN AUF BEHÄLTERN | [2016/22] | English: | METHODS FOR IMPROVING SECUREMENT OF LABELS TO CONTAINERS | [2016/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT D'AMÉLIORER LA FIXATION D'ÉTIQUETTES À DES RÉCIPIENTS | [2016/22] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 19.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/48] | 18.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5855710 (HINTON GAYLEN ROY [US]); | [Y]US6332631 (KIRK DANA S [US]); | [Y]US2003056410 (WITKOWSKI DANIEL D [US]); | [Y]US2011314772 (GEORGE PATRICK [US]); | [Y]US2012135208 (HILLEREAU JEAN-MICHEL [FR]); | [Y]US2012216951 (KIAN KOUROSH [US], et al); | [Y]US2013022797 (LORENCE JAMES P [US], et al); | [Y]US2013065019 (CAMPEAU ANNE P [US], et al); | [Y]US2013071589 (HANNINGTON MICHAEL [US], et al) | by applicant | US2011314772 | US2013071589 |