EP3026129 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING BRIQUETTES AND REDUCED IRON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho (Kobe Steel, Ltd.) 2-4, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 2-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | [2016/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUCHIYA, Osamu c/o Kobe Steel, Ltd. 2-4, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 2-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Hidetoshi c/o Kobe Steel, Ltd. 2-4, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 2-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | [2016/22] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2016/22] | Application number, filing date | 14829405.1 | 26.05.2014 | [2016/22] | WO2014JP63829 | Priority number, date | JP20130154793 | 25.07.2013 Original published format: JP 2013154793 | [2016/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015011981 | Date: | 29.01.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3026129 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C22B1/24, C21B13/00, C22B1/16 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
C22B1/16 (EP,RU,US);
C21B13/146 (US);
C21B13/0046 (EP,US);
C21B13/0066 (EP,US);
C22B1/02 (EP,US);
C22B1/2406 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BRIKETTS UND REDUZIERTEM EISEN | [2016/22] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING BRIQUETTES AND REDUCED IRON | [2016/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE BRIQUETTES ET DE FER RÉDUIT | [2016/22] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2016 | Translation filed | 28.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 28.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/30] | 19.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5560762 (BRESSER WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]CA2378956 (VOEST ALPINE IND ANLAGEN [AT]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [A]AU2009271984B (JFE STEEL CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2009144240 (JFE STEEL CORP); | [A]JP2010043354 (JFE STEEL CORP) | by applicant | - "Tetsutohagane", RELATION BETWEEN ORE-GRINDABILITY AND OPTIMUM SIZE FOR PELLETIZING NIHON TEKKO KYOKAI-SHI, 49TH YEAR, (1963), no. 3, pages 346 - 348 |