EP3026145 - TREATED SURFACE COPPER FOIL, COPPER FOIL WITH CARRIER, SUBSTRATE, RESIN SUBSTRATE, PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD, COPPER CLAD LAMINATE, AND PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JX Nippon Mining & Metals Corporation 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8164 / JP | [2016/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHII, Masafumi c/o Hitachi Works JX Nippon Mining&Metals Corporation 3-1 Shirogane-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 317-0056 / JP | 02 /
HONDA, Misato c/o Hitachi Works JX Nippon Mining&Metals Corporation 3-1 Shirogane-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 317-0056 / JP | 03 /
MIYAMOTO, Nobuaki c/o Hitachi Works JX Nippon Mining&Metals Corporation 3-1 Shirogane-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 317-0056 / JP | [2016/22] | Representative(s) | Yeadon IP Limited Nexus Discovery Way Leeds LS2 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/22] | Yeadon IP Limited Leeds Innovation Centre 103 Clarendon Road Leeds LS2 9DF / GB | Application number, filing date | 14829592.6 | 23.07.2014 | [2016/22] | WO2014JP69489 | Priority number, date | JP20130153014 | 23.07.2013 Original published format: JP 2013153014 | JP20130153010 | 23.07.2013 Original published format: JP 2013153010 | JP20130160827 | 01.08.2013 Original published format: JP 2013160827 | JP20130160828 | 01.08.2013 Original published format: JP 2013160828 | [2016/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015012327 | Date: | 29.01.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3026145 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C25D7/06, B32B15/08, H05K1/09, H05K3/18, H05K3/38 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
H05K3/025 (EP,US);
B32B15/08 (EP,US);
B32B15/20 (EP,US);
B32B3/26 (EP,US);
C25D7/0614 (EP,US);
H05K3/205 (EP,US);
H05K3/384 (EP,US);
H05K3/389 (EP,US);
B32B2457/08 (EP,US);
C23C18/1653 (EP,US);
C23C18/405 (EP,US);
C25D1/04 (EP,US);
C25D3/38 (EP,US);
C25D3/562 (EP,US);
C25D3/58 (EP,US);
C25D5/022 (EP,US);
C25D5/10 (EP,US);
C25D5/18 (EP,US);
C25D5/34 (EP,US);
C25D5/48 (EP,US);
C25D5/611 (EP,US);
C25D7/0671 (EP,US);
H05K1/09 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0355 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0307 (EP,US);
H05K2203/072 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0726 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] | Title | German: | KUPFERFOLIE MIT BEHANDELTER OBERFLÄCHE, KUPFERFOLIE MIT TRÄGER, SUBSTRAT, HARZSUBSTRAT, LEITERPLATTE, KUPFERKASCHIERTES LAMINAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER LEITERPLATTE | [2016/22] | English: | TREATED SURFACE COPPER FOIL, COPPER FOIL WITH CARRIER, SUBSTRATE, RESIN SUBSTRATE, PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD, COPPER CLAD LAMINATE, AND PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2016/22] | French: | FEUILLE DE CUIVRE TRAITÉE EN SURFACE, FEUILLE DE CUIVRE AVEC SUPPORT, SUBSTRAT, SUBSTRAT DE RÉSINE, CARTE À CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ, STRATIFIÉ CUIVRÉ, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE CARTE À CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ | [2016/22] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2016 | Translation filed | 22.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 04.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/04] | 22.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2021 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2011209903 (UNO TAKEO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9 * paragraphs [0034] , [0041] - [0071] - [0091]; figure - * [Y] 10,11,13,17,18 [I] 16; | [XI]JP2011074405 (HITACHI CABLE) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0015] - [0017] - [0034]; figure - * [I] 7-9; | [XI]US2008280159 (IWAKIRI KENICHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0032] , [0079] - [0084]; figure - * [I] 4; | [Y]JP5204908B (JX NIPPON MINING & METALS CORP) [Y] 10,13,17 * the whole document *; | [E]US2016242281 (NAGAURA TOMOTA [JP], et al) [E] 10,13,17 * paragraphs [0063] , [0163] - [0173]; figure - *; | [Y]US2009183901 (KATAOKA TATSUO [JP], et al) [Y] 11,18 * paragraphs [0070] - [0137]; figure - * | International search | [X]JP2008285751 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO); | [XE]WO2012043182 (JX NIPPON MINING & METALS CORP [JP], et al); | [X]JP2012144021 (UNITIKA LTD); | [X]JP2011040727 (AJINOMOTO KK); | [X]JP2011040728 (AJINOMOTO KK) | by applicant | JP2006196863 | WO2008004399 | WO2008053878 | WO2009084533 | JPH115828 | JPH11140281 | WO9702728 | JP3676375B | JP2000043188 | JP2002179772 | JP2002359444 | JP2003304068 | JP2003249739 | JP2004082687 | JP2004349654 | JP2005262506 | JP2005053218 | JP4178415B | WO2004005588 | JP2006257153 | JP2007326923 | JP2008111169 | WO2006028207 | JP4828427B | JP2009067029 | WO2006134868 | JP5046927B | JP2009173017 | WO2007105635 | JP5180815B | WO2008114858 | WO2009008471 | JP2011014727 | WO2009001850 | WO2009145179 | WO2011068157 | JP2013019056 |