EP3024948 - GENETIC ASSAYS FOR DETECTING VIRAL RECOMBINATION RATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/22] | GENETIC ASSAYS | ||
[2019/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bio-rad Laboratories, Inc. 1000 Alfred Nobel Drive Hercules, CA 94547 / US | [2016/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARLIN-NEUMANN, George 1064 Arrowhead Way Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 02 /
TZONEV, Svilen 121 Rocky Creek Place Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | [2016/22] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2020/03] |
Former [2016/22] | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 14829649.4 | 25.07.2014 | [2016/22] | WO2014US48301 | Priority number, date | US201361858311P | 25.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361858311 P | US201361899027P | 01.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361899027 P | [2016/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015013681 | Date: | 29.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3024948 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3024948 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6827, C12Q1/70 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
C12Q1/703 (EP,US);
C12N15/102 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6827 (EP,US);
C12Q1/70 (EP,US);
C12Q1/701 (EP,US);
G01N33/56983 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6827, C12Q2531/113, C12Q2537/143, C12Q2537/165, C12Q2563/159 (EP,US);
C12Q1/70, C12Q2531/113, C12Q2537/143, C12Q2537/165, C12Q2563/159 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2017/14] | C12Q1/68, C12Q1/70, G01N33/543 | ||
Former IPC [2016/22] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GENETISCHE TESTS ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER VIRALEN REKOMBINATIONSFREQUENZ | [2019/30] | English: | GENETIC ASSAYS FOR DETECTING VIRAL RECOMBINATION RATE | [2019/30] | French: | DOSAGES GÉNÉTIQUES POUR DÉTERMINER UNE FREQUENCE DE LA RECOMBINATION VIRALE | [2019/30] |
Former [2016/22] | GENETISCHE TESTS | ||
Former [2016/22] | GENETIC ASSAYS | ||
Former [2016/22] | DOSAGES GÉNÉTIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 08.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.12.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 04.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.07.2014 | AL | 15.01.2020 | AT | 15.01.2020 | CY | 15.01.2020 | CZ | 15.01.2020 | DK | 15.01.2020 | EE | 15.01.2020 | ES | 15.01.2020 | FI | 15.01.2020 | HR | 15.01.2020 | IT | 15.01.2020 | LT | 15.01.2020 | LV | 15.01.2020 | MC | 15.01.2020 | MK | 15.01.2020 | MT | 15.01.2020 | NL | 15.01.2020 | PL | 15.01.2020 | RO | 15.01.2020 | RS | 15.01.2020 | SE | 15.01.2020 | SI | 15.01.2020 | SK | 15.01.2020 | SM | 15.01.2020 | TR | 15.01.2020 | BG | 15.04.2020 | NO | 15.04.2020 | GR | 16.04.2020 | IS | 15.05.2020 | PT | 07.06.2020 | IE | 25.07.2020 | LU | 25.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 25.07.2014 | |
AL | 15.01.2020 | ||
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
CY | 15.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
MT | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
TR | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
IE | 25.07.2020 | ||
LU | 25.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 25.07.2014 | |
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
CY | 15.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
MT | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
TR | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
IE | 25.07.2020 | ||
LU | 25.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
IE | 25.07.2020 | ||
LU | 25.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
LU | 25.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
LU | 25.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 15.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002151040 (O' KEEFE MATTHEW [US], et al) [X] 1,8,9 * paragraphs [0108] - [0111] *; | [A]WO2007008605 (NIMAN HENRY L [US]) [A] 1-11 * claims 1,29 *; | [A]WO2007044091 (FLUIDIGM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * claim 1 *; | [E]WO2015048571 (BIO RAD LABORATORIES [US]) [E] 1,8,9* claims 1,30,46 *; | [X] - A. D. TADMOR ET AL, "Probing Individual Environmental Bacteria for Viruses by Using Microfluidic Digital PCR", SCIENCE, (20110701), vol. 333, no. 6038, doi:10.1126/science.1200758, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 58 - 62, XP055344735 [X] 1,3,5-7 * figures S1,3; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1200758 | [ ] - A. D. TADMOR ET AL, "Probing Individual Environmental Bacteria for Viruses by Using Microfluidic Digital PCR - Supporting Online Material", SCIENCE, (20110630), vol. 333, no. 6038, doi:10.1126/science.1200758, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1 - 48, XP055344921 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1200758 | [X] - K. MOTOMURA ET AL, "Genetic Recombination between Human Immunodeficiency Virus Type 1 (HIV-1) and HIV-2, Two Distinct Human Lentiviruses", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY., US, (20080215), vol. 82, no. 4, doi:10.1128/JVI.01937-07, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 1923 - 1933, XP055344736 [X] 1-7 * page 1924, column r, paragraphs 4,5; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.01937-07 | [X] - WANG JIANBIN ET AL, "Genome-wide Single-Cell Analysis of Recombination Activity and De Novo Mutation Rates in Human Sperm", CELL, (20120720), vol. 150, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.CELL.2012.06.030, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 402 - 412, XP028930183 [X] 1,8-11 * page 403, column r * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2012.06.030 | [X] - Jun Takehisa ET AL, "Human Immunodeficiency Virus Type 1 Intergroup (M/O) Recombination in Cameroon", Journal of Virology, UNITED STATES, (19990801), pages 6810 - 6820, URL: http://jvi.asm.org/content/73/8/6810.full.pdf#page=1&view=FitH, XP055345814 [X] 1-4 * page 6811, column l, paragraph 5 * * page 6819, column r, paragraph l * | International search | [Y]WO0104360 (UAB RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US], et al); | [X]US2004005710 (SON HO-SUN [KR], et al); | [Y]US2004091905 (GUO BAOCHUAN [US]); | [Y]WO2005054506 (BABRAHAM INST [GB], et al); | [A]US2006286580 (LIN BAOCHUAN [US], et al); | [X]US2009047669 (ZHANG JIAN PING [US], et al); | [Y]US2010092973 (DAVIES MARK [IE], et al); | [Y]WO2013093530 (KPS ORVOSI BIOTECHNOLOGIAI ES EGESZSEGUEGYI SZOLGALTATO KFT [HU]); | [X] - MALOU ET AL., "Immuno-PCR: a promising ultrasensitive diagnostic method to detect antigens and antibodies", TRENDS IN MICROBIOLOGY, (20110601), vol. 19, no. 6, pages 296 - 301, XP028374584 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tim.2011.03.004 |